EP1312316 - Fixation element for connection of broken bone parts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2011 | Change - representative | published on 28.09.2011 [2011/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tantum AG Mühlenhof 65 24534 Neumünster / DE | [2003/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arpe, Michael Düvelsbeker Weg 12 24105 Kiel / DE | 02 /
Mamero, Thomas Düvelsbeker Weg 22 24105 Kiel / DE | 03 /
Jensen, Ham-Iven Haffkamp 16 24214 Noer / DE | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Biehl, Christian, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Biehl Schlieffenallee 5 24105 Kiel / DE | [2011/39] |
Former [2003/21] | Biehl, Christian, Dipl.-Phys. Boehmert & Boehmert, Anwaltssozietät, Niemannsweg 133 24105 Kiel / DE | Application number, filing date | 02024670.8 | 05.11.2002 | [2003/21] | Priority number, date | DE2001218441U | 14.11.2001 Original published format: DE 20118441 U | [2003/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1312316 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1312316 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | [2003/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/64 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
A61B17/6466 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/21] | Title | German: | Fixationselement zur Herstellung einer Fixationsverbindung auseinandergebrochener Knochenteile | [2003/21] | English: | Fixation element for connection of broken bone parts | [2003/21] | French: | Elément de fixation pour la connexion de parties d'os fracturé | [2003/21] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/51] | 16.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/02] | 11.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]CH303453 (HOFFMANN RAOUL DR [CH]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 1 - column 1, line 27; figure 3 * * column 3, line 3 - column 3, line 7 * [Y] 3,5; | [X]FR2163168 (MULLER JEAN NICOLAS) [X] 1,2 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4135505 (DAY WILLIAM H) [A] 1,2* the whole document *; | [A]FR2520607 (BOSSI ENRICO [IT]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0469304 (OLERUD SVEN [SE]) [Y] 3 * column 5, line 22 - column 5, line 36; figure 7 *; | [Y]US6296644 (SAURAT JEAN [FR], et al) [Y] 5 * column 5, line 9 - column 5, line 11; figure 1 * |