EP1308570 - Vacuum joining for containers or structures produced under vacuum [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Vac Company GmbH Industriestrasse 54 49492 Westerkappeln-Velpe / DE | [2003/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heise, Jörg Feldstrasse 26 49143 Bissendorf / DE | 02 /
Keur, Arij Rossinistrasse 26 49565 Bramsche / DE | [2003/19] | Representative(s) | Lins, Martina, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Lins, Martina, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR Freundallee 13a 30173 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2003/19] | Läufer, Martina, Dr., et al Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR Freundallee 13 30173 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 02024692.2 | 05.11.2002 | [2003/19] | Priority number, date | DE2001155028 | 05.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10155028 | [2003/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1308570 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1308570 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/80, B23K26/12 | [2007/29] | CPC: |
B23K26/12 (EP);
B23K26/1224 (EP);
B23K26/123 (EP);
E04B1/803 (EP);
Y02A30/242 (EP);
Y02B80/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/19] | E04B1/80 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/13] |
Former [2003/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vakuum-Fügen für in-vacuo hergestellte Vakuumbehältnisse und Strukturen | [2003/19] | English: | Vacuum joining for containers or structures produced under vacuum | [2003/19] | French: | Assemblage sous vide de conteneurs ou de structures produites sous vide | [2003/19] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/29] | 28.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0862032 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 17-32 * the whole document *[A] 1-16 | by applicant | DE4015895 | DE4206563 | DE4214002 | US5500305 | US5695844 | DE19801612 | DE19758219 | DE19814271 | DE19904799 | DE19914963 | DE10000260 | DE20012547U |