EP1310189 - Desk system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UCHIDA YOKO Co., Ltd. 4-7, Shinkawa 2-Chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo-To / JP | [2006/21] |
Former [2003/20] | For all designated states UCHIDA YOKO Co., Ltd. 4-7, Shinkawa 2-Chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo-To / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okamoto, Atsuo Uchida Yoko Co., Ltd., Shiomi Office 9-15, Shiomi 2-chome, Koto-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kunishita, Takashi Uchida Yoko Co., Ltd., Shiomi Office 9-15, Shiomi 2-chome, Koto-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Tachikawa, Hideki Uchida Yoko Co., Ltd., Shiomi Office 9-15, Shiomi 2-chome, Koto-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Wakasugi, Koichi Uchida Yoko Co., Ltd., Shiomi Office 9-15, Shiomi 2-chome, Koto-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Matsuda, Tetsuya Uchida Yoko Co., Ltd., Shiomi Office 9-15, Shiomi 2-chome, Koto-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2003/20] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Roland Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/20] | Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02024741.7 | 06.11.2002 | [2003/20] | Priority number, date | JP20010346613 | 12.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001346613 | [2003/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1310189 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1310189 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | [2004/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1310189 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A47B17/02, A47B21/02 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
A47B17/02 (EP,US);
A47B1/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2003/20] | A47B17/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/20] | Title | German: | Arbeitstischsystem | [2003/20] | English: | Desk system | [2003/20] | French: | Système de bureau | [2003/20] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 03.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.05.2006 | BE | 24.05.2006 | CH | 24.05.2006 | CY | 24.05.2006 | CZ | 24.05.2006 | EE | 24.05.2006 | FI | 24.05.2006 | IT | 24.05.2006 | LI | 24.05.2006 | NL | 24.05.2006 | SK | 24.05.2006 | TR | 24.05.2006 | BG | 24.08.2006 | DK | 24.08.2006 | SE | 24.08.2006 | GR | 25.08.2006 | ES | 04.09.2006 | PT | 24.10.2006 | IE | 06.11.2006 | LU | 06.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2006 | ||
EE | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
TR | 24.05.2006 | ||
BG | 24.08.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
IE | 06.11.2006 | ||
LU | 06.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2006 | ||
EE | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
BG | 24.08.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
IE | 06.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2006 | ||
EE | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
IE | 06.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
IE | 06.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
IE | 06.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 24.08.2006 | |
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 24.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1125797 (PANNEAUX LANDAIS SOPALAND SOC) [A] 17* the whole document *; | [XY]DE9110690U (PFALZMÖBEL BÜROEINRICHTUNGSFABRIK GMBH & CO.) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [Y] 6,9; | [A]WO9532644 (SYKES CHRISTOPHER C [AU]) [A] 1,14,17,19 * abstract * * page 14, line 31 - page 16, line 33; figures 1,2,6 *; | [A]EP0765738 (ONNETSU KANKYO KAIHATSU INC [JP], et al) [A] 17 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE29903368U (WELLE MOEBEL GMBH [DE]) [Y] 6,9 * the whole document *; | [E]WO03037140 (CRAIE [FR], et al) [E] 1-3,6,9,10 * the whole document * |