EP1310901 - Contactless communication system and data carrier used for the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/20] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakai, Yuichiro 3-2-7-303, Sumiyoshi Higashimachi, Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 658-0052 / JP | 02 /
Nakashima, Shota 1-32-12, Nasuzukuri Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0071 / JP | [2003/20] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/20] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02024977.7 | 07.11.2002 | [2003/20] | Priority number, date | JP20010343943 | 09.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001343943 | [2003/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1310901 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1310901 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | [2004/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/00, G06K19/07 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
G06K7/0008 (EP,US);
G06K19/0723 (EP,US);
G06K7/10039 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, NL [2004/42] |
Former [2003/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kontaktloses Kommunikationssystem und hierbei verwendetem Datenträger | [2003/20] | English: | Contactless communication system and data carrier used for the same | [2003/20] | French: | Dispositif pour communication sans contact et support de donnees | [2003/20] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 01.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/45] | 06.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/45] | Divisional application(s) | EP05007663.7 / EP1557782 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5539394 (CATO ROBERT T [US], et al) [A] 5-8,11,12 * column 5, line 29 - column 7, line 25; figure 4 *; | [A]WO9822903 (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al) [A] 5-8,11,12* page 6, paragraph L - page 8, paragraph L; figures 2-4 *; | [A]EP0862133 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] * abstract *; | [A]EP0866401 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-4,9,10 * column 19, line 20 - line 37; figures 14,15 *; | [A]US6002344 (BANDY WILLIAM R [US], et al) [A] 1-4,9,10 * column 3, line 1 - line 25 * * column 6, line 63 - column 7, line 33; figure 5 *; | [A]WO9965168 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 5-8,11,12 * page 13, line 4 - page 21, line 6; figure 5 * | Examination | US5339073 | EP0942386 |