EP1314537 - Hose molding device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 1144 East Market Street Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1144 East Market Street Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mattie, Dennis Michael 454 Oak Street, Apartment 12 Collingwood, Ontario L9Y 2Y9 / CA | 02 /
Gerynowicz, Stanley David R.R. 2 Stayner, Ontario L0M 1S0 / CA | 03 /
Walsh, Jeffrey James R.R. 3 (570 County Road 12) Roblin, Ontario K0K 2W0 / CA | [2003/22] | Representative(s) | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A. Patent Department 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A. Patent Department 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | ||
Former [2003/22] | Leitz, Paul Goodyear S.A., Patent-Department 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | Application number, filing date | 02025034.6 | 11.11.2002 | [2003/22] | Priority number, date | US20010992184 | 16.11.2001 Original published format: US 992184 | [2003/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1314537 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1314537 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B29C53/08, B29C53/82, // B29K21/00, B29L23/00 | [2006/21] | CPC: |
B29C53/82 (EP,US);
B29C53/083 (EP,US);
B29K2021/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/47] | B29C53/08, B29C53/82, // B29K21/00, B29L23/00 | ||
Former IPC [2003/22] | B29C53/08, // B29K21/00, B29L23/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/31] |
Former [2003/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schlauchformungswerkzeug | [2003/22] | English: | Hose molding device | [2003/22] | French: | Dispositif pour mettre en forme un tuyau | [2003/22] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 24.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/09] | 09.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2422557 (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG) [A] 1-4 * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 5, paragraph 1; figure 1; claims 1-3,6 *; | [A]US4371554 (BECKER HEINZ [CH]) [A] 1-4* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]FR2520664 (CAOUTCHOUC MANUF PLASTIQUE [FR]) [A] 1-4 * page 5, lines 26-38; figure 6 * |