EP1312889 - Inductive angle sensor in particular for a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 21.01.2009 [2009/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hella KGaA Hueck & Co. Rixbecker Strasse 75 59552 Lippstadt / DE | [2004/48] |
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states Hella KG Hueck & Co. Rixbecker Strasse 75 59552 Lippstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Franz-Josef Hubertusweg 13 33154 Salzkotten / DE | 02 /
Irle, Henning Weissdornallee 40 59557 Lippstadt / DE | 03 /
Kost, Norbert Fontaneweg 10 59557 Erwitte / DE | [2003/21] | Application number, filing date | 02025142.7 | 09.11.2002 | [2003/21] | Priority number, date | DE2001156238 | 15.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10156238 | [2003/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1312889 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1312889 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | [2004/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1312889 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01B7/30, G01D5/20 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
G01D5/2066 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2005/20] |
Former [2003/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Induktiver Winkelsensor, insbesondere für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [2003/21] | English: | Inductive angle sensor in particular for a motor vehicle | [2003/21] | French: | Capteur d'angle inductif en particulier pour une voiture | [2003/21] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 26.02.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | 03.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.04.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 23.01.2008 | ES | 04.05.2008 | [2009/04] |
Former [2008/35] | ES | 04.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]DE19941464 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [DY] 1-6 * claim 1 * * column 1, line 17 * * column 2, lines 32-34 * * column 3, lines 1-22 * * figure 4 *; | [Y]WO9961868 (ABSOLUTE SENSORS LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-6 * claims 21,23,48 * |