EP1312952 - Optical fiber collimator using gradient index rod lens [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 4-7-28, Kitahama, Chuou-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8559 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 4-7-28, Kitahama, Chuou-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8559 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukuzawa, Takashi, Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 4-7-28, Kitahama, Chuou-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8559 / JP | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Grimm, Christian, et al Geyer, Fehners & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Perhamerstrasse 31 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | Grimm, Christian Jan Rainer, et al Geyer, Fehners & Partner, Patentanwälte, Perhamerstrasse 31 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02025278.9 | 12.11.2002 | [2003/21] | Priority number, date | JP20010350533 | 15.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001350533 | [2003/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1312952 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/32 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
G02B6/327 (EP,US);
G02B6/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/07] |
Former [2003/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optischer Faserkollimator mit Gradientenindexlinse | [2003/21] | English: | Optical fiber collimator using gradient index rod lens | [2003/21] | French: | Collimateur à fibres optiques utilisant une lentille à gradient d'indice | [2003/21] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 17.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/39] | 28.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0370663 (PLESSEY OVERSEAS [GB]) [X] 1,4,7,9 * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 25; figure 2 * [Y] 2,3,5,6,8,10,11; | [Y]WO0111403 (CORNING INC [US]) [Y] 2,5,10 * page 2, line 4 - page 3, line 14; figure 1 *; | [Y] - SELFOC Product Guide, SELFOC PRODUCT GUIDE, XX, XX, PAGE(S) 1-35, (199309), XP002190689 [Y] 3,5,6,8,10,11 * page 13; table 4 * * page 15, paragraph 1 - paragraph L * | [Y] - MOORE DUNCAN T, Handbook of Optics, VoIume II, Devices, Measurements, & Properties, 2nd Edition, Chapter 9: Gradient Index Optics, HANDBOOK OF OPTICS. DEVICES, MEASUREMENTS, AND PROPERTIES, NEW YORK, MCGRAW-HILL, US, VOL. VOL. 2, PAGE(S) 91-910, ISBN 0-07-047974-7, XP002194081 [Y] 3,8 * page 9.6, paragraph 1 - paragraph 4 * |