EP1314515 - Screw clamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BESSEY Tool GmbH & Co. KG Mühlwiesenstrasse 40 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2006/20] |
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states Bessey & Sohn GmbH & Co. KG Mühlwiesenstrasse 40 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | ||
Former [2003/35] | For all designated states Bessey & Sohn GmbH & Co Mühlwiesenstrasse 40 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | ||
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states Bessey & Sohn GmbH & Co. Mühlwiesenstrasse 40 D-74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foshag, Siegfried, Dr. Theodor-Gugel-Strasse 19 73765 Neuhausen / DE | 02 /
Klöpfer, Gerhard Bachgartenstrasse 50 74385 Pleidelsheim / DE | 03 /
Philipp, Karl Schubartstrasse 131 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2003/35] |
Former [2003/22] | 01 /
Foshag, Siegfried, Dr. Theodor-Gugel-Strasse 19 73765 Neuhausen / DE | ||
02 /
Klöpfer, Gerhard Bachgartenstrasse 50 74385 Pleidelsheim / DE | |||
03 /
Philipp, Larl Schubartstrasse 131 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02025466.0 | 15.11.2002 | [2003/22] | Priority number, date | DE2001158005 | 22.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10158005 | [2003/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1314515 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1314515 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B25B5/10, B25B5/16 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
B25B5/102 (EP,US);
B25B5/163 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/44] |
Former [2003/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bügelzwinge | [2003/22] | English: | Screw clamp | [2003/22] | French: | Serre-joints | [2003/22] | Examination procedure | 21.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/07] | 26.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1402739 (MAYER) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [DA]EP0010260 (BESSEY & SOHN [DE]) [DA] 1,27,28 * figures 1-5 *; | [DA]DE3128023 (BESSEY & SOHN [DE]) [DA] 1,2,7-9,13-16,21 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE8703051U (RHOMBUS TOOLS LTD., HALESOWEN, WEST MIDLANDS, GB) [A] 38* figure 1 *; | [A]DE3700955 (BESSEY & SOHN [DE]) [A] 1,4,5,22-26 * column 9, line 59 - column 10, line 2 *; | [A]EP0354290 (VALOUR JEAN PAUL) [A] 27,28 * the whole document *; | [A]DE9216285U (SCHMIDT, PETER, 2000 HAMBURG, DE) [A] 31-34 * figures 1,11,15-19 *; | [A]DE19546048 (GROSS & FROELICH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1a * |