EP1298817 - Random access communication method by use of CDMA, and system for mobile stations which use the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states NTT Mobile Communications Network Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Umeda, Narumi c/o Int. Prop.Dpt., NTTDoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park.Tower,11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-Ku, Tokio 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
Douzono, Youichi c/o Int.Prop.Dpt., NTT DoCoMo inc Sanno Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
Matsumoto, Tadashi, NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Int.Prop.Dpt. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2004/23] |
Former [2003/20] | 01 /
Umeda, Narumi 968-12-2-201, Mutsuuracho, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | ||
02 /
Douzono, Youichi c/o Int.Prop.Dpt., NTT DoCoMo inc Sanno Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
03 /
Matsumoto, Tadashi, NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Int.Prop.Dpt. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
Former [2003/16] | 01 /
Umeda, Narumi 968-12-2-201, Mutsuuracho, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | ||
02 /
Douzono, Youichi c/o Int.Prop.Dpt., NTT DoCoMo inc Sanno Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
03 /
Matsumoto, Tadashi 4-501, 2-1-3, Hayashi Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP | |||
Former [2003/14] | 01 /
Umeda, Narumi 968-12-2-201, Mutsuuracho, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | ||
02 /
Douzono, Youichi 1-27-5-104, Hairando Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP | |||
03 /
Matsumoto, Tadashi 4-501, 2-1-3, Hayashi Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | Hoffmann, Eckart, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Bahnhofstrasse 103 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | Application number, filing date | 02025512.1 | 03.03.1994 | [2003/14] | Priority number, date | JP19930044236 | 05.03.1993 Original published format: JP 4423693 | JP19930119923 | 21.05.1993 Original published format: JP 11992393 | [2003/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1298817 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1298817 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04J13/00 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
H04W74/08 (EP,US);
H04B1/707 (EP,US);
H04B7/2628 (EP,US);
H04B2201/709709 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [2003/14] | Title | German: | CDMA Kommunikationsverfahren mit wahlfreiem Zugriff und Anordnung für mobile Stationen mit diesem Verfahren | [2003/14] | English: | Random access communication method by use of CDMA, and system for mobile stations which use the method | [2003/14] | French: | Method de communication CDMA avec accès aléatoire et système pour stations mobiles utilisant cette méthode | [2003/14] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 21.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94908485.9 / EP0639899 | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0095959 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [A] 1-28* claim - *; | [A]GB2172777 (HAZELTINE CORP) [A] 1-28 * page 1, column R, line 85 - page 2, column L, line 25 *; | [A]US4701905 (UN CHONG K [KR], et al) [A] 1-28 * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 68; figure 5 *; | [A]EP0428046 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-28 * figure -; claim - * |