EP1313198 - Improved rotation support, particularly for rotors of electric motors of pumps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Askoll Holding S.r.l. Via Industria 30 36031 Dueville / IT | [2003/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marioni, Elio Via Molino, 6 36031 Dueville (Prov. of Vicenza) / IT | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Botti, Mario, et al Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/31] | Botti, Mario, et al Botti & Ferrari S.r.l., Via Locatelli, 5 20124 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2003/21] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 02025591.5 | 15.11.2002 | [2003/21] | Priority number, date | IT2001PD00268 | 20.11.2001 Original published format: IT PD20010268 | [2003/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1313198 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1313198 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | [2005/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1313198 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/167 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
H02K5/1675 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/21] | Title | German: | Verbessertes Mittel zur Rotation, insbesondere für Läufer einer elektrischen angetriebenen Pumpe | [2003/21] | English: | Improved rotation support, particularly for rotors of electric motors of pumps | [2003/21] | French: | Moyens perfectionnés de rotation, notamment pour rotor de pompe à entraînement électrique | [2003/21] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 12.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.02.2007 | BE | 28.02.2007 | CH | 28.02.2007 | CY | 28.02.2007 | CZ | 28.02.2007 | DK | 28.02.2007 | EE | 28.02.2007 | FI | 28.02.2007 | FR | 28.02.2007 | LI | 28.02.2007 | NL | 28.02.2007 | SK | 28.02.2007 | TR | 28.02.2007 | BG | 29.05.2007 | GR | 29.05.2007 | SE | 31.05.2007 | ES | 08.06.2007 | PT | 30.07.2007 | IE | 15.11.2007 | LU | 15.11.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
CY | 28.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
EE | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
FR | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
IE | 15.11.2007 | ||
LU | 15.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
CY | 28.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
EE | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
FR | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
IE | 15.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
EE | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
FR | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
IE | 15.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
FR | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
IE | 15.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
FR | 19.10.2007 | ||
IE | 15.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
FR | 19.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CH | 28.02.2007 | |
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | CH | 28.02.2007 | |
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11230166 ; | [A]JPS5959039 ; | [A]US3441325 (SJOTUN KYRRE GUTTORM) [A] 1,8 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5689146 (CHEEVER CHARLES J [US]) [A] 1 * figures 3,4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991130), vol. 1999, no. 13, & JP11230166 A 19990827 (SHARP CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840719), vol. 008, no. 155, Database accession no. (E - 256), & JP59059039 A 19840404 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 1,3,5,6 * abstract * |