EP1316350 - Process and device for purifying fermentation gases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2005 [2005/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | For all designated states Siloxa Engineering AG Katernberger Strasse 107 45327 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27 c 80686 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Siloxa Engineering AG Katernberger Strasse 107 45327 Essen / DE | |||
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Siloxa Engineering AG Katernberger Strasse 107 45327 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwerdt, Peter, Dipl.Ing. Biberweg 2 46535 Dinslaken / DE | 02 /
Doczyck, Wolfgang, Dipl.Ing. Kärtner Strasse 42 46047 Oberhausen / DE | [2003/23] | Representative(s) | Gagel, Roland Patentanwalt Dr. Roland Gagel Landsberger Strasse 480a 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | Gagel, Roland, Dr. Patentanwalt Dr. Roland Gagel, Landsberger Strasse 480a 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02025665.7 | 20.11.2002 | [2003/23] | Priority number, date | DE20011058804 | 30.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10158804 | [2003/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1316350 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/14, B01D53/86 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
B01D53/14 (EP);
B01D53/8665 (EP);
Y02E50/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anlage zur Reinigung von Faulgasen | [2003/23] | English: | Process and device for purifying fermentation gases | [2003/23] | French: | Installation et procédé pour l'épuration des gaz de fermentation | [2003/23] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/47] | 07.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/42] | 29.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19810993 (DOCZYCK WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * column 1, line 24 - line 66 *; | [A]EP0955352 (HAASE ENERGIETECH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * claim 1 *; | [A]DE10008247 (SCHULZE OSWALD KG [DE]) [A] 1-11* claim 1 * |