EP1293523 - Pigment dispersions containing aqueous branched polymer dispersant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Antonelli, Joseph, Albert 1103 Mainsail Circle, Sea Colony Jupiter, Florida 33477 / US | 02 /
Jakubauskas, Henry L. Nine Gates R.D. 1 Chadds Ford, PA 19317 / US | 03 /
Scopazzi, Christopher 2 Wollaston Road Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | [2003/12] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2003/12] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro, Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 02025830.7 | 29.10.1997 | [2003/12] | Priority number, date | US19960738633 | 29.10.1996 Original published format: US 738633 | [2003/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1293523 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1293523 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08F290/04, C09D155/00 | [2003/12] | CPC: |
C09D155/005 (EP,US);
C08F290/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08F257/02 (EP,US);
C08F265/04 (EP,US);
C08F290/044 (EP,US);
C08F290/046 (EP,US);
C08F290/06 (EP,US);
C08L51/003 (EP,US);
C09B67/009 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L51/003, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C09D151/003, C08L2666/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [2003/12] | Title | German: | Pigmentdispersionen enthaltend ein Dispergiermittel mit wässrigen Verzweigungen | [2003/12] | English: | Pigment dispersions containing aqueous branched polymer dispersant | [2003/12] | French: | Dispersions de pigments contenant un dispersant polymère ramifié aqueux | [2003/12] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 05.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/16] | 18.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/16] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97946861.8 / EP0935623 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3928255 (MILKOVICH RALPH, et al) [X] 1 * column 20, lines 35-41; example -; claim 1 *; | [A]US5290633 (DEVLIN BRIAN P [US], et al) [A] 1* column 2, lines 28-54 - column 8, lines 37-48 *; | [X]WO9519999 (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0728780 (ROEHM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-4 * page 1, line 33 - page 3, line 54 *; | [A] - TSUKAHARA Y ET AL, "WATER-SOLUBLE GRAFT COPOLYMERS FROM MACROMONOMER METHOD", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, POLYMER CHEMISTRY EDITION, (19890301), vol. 27, no. 4, pages 1099 - 1114, XP000086129 [A] 1 * page 1100 - page 1101 * |