EP1344957 - Pneumatic suspension and damping device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2006 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Aktiengesellschaft Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2003/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Behmenburg, Christof, Dr. Königsbreite 2 31867 Lauenau / DE | 02 /
Job, Heinz Ricklinger Strasse 5 31535 Neustadt / DE | 03 /
Märtens, Michael, Dr. Elhenbachstrasse 6 60316 Frankfurt/Main / DE | 04 /
Härtel, Volker, Dr. Fichtenstrasse 50 82110 Germering / DE | 05 /
Huber, Gerald, Dr. Kollenrodtstrasse 5 30161 Hannover / DE | 06 /
Kilsch, Armin Ohefeldweg 3 30559 Hannover / DE | 07 /
Engelke, Thomas Kramerstrasse 19 30159 Hannover / DE | 08 /
Kott, Burkhard Dresdener Strasse 77 30179 Hannover / DE | [2003/38] | Application number, filing date | 02026122.8 | 23.11.2002 | [2003/38] | Priority number, date | EP20020005722 | 13.03.2002 Original published format: EP 02005722 | [2003/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1344957 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1344957 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/04, B60G17/052, B60G11/27 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
B60G17/0521 (EP,US);
F16F9/0454 (EP,US);
F16F9/0472 (EP,US);
F16F9/05 (EP,US);
F16F9/055 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/38] | Title | German: | Pneumatische Federungs- und Dämpfungsvorrichtung | [2003/38] | English: | Pneumatic suspension and damping device | [2003/38] | French: | Dispositif de suspension et d'amortissement pneumatique | [2003/38] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 27.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 05.10.2005 | EE | 05.10.2005 | FI | 05.10.2005 | IE | 05.10.2005 | NL | 05.10.2005 | SK | 05.10.2005 | TR | 05.10.2005 | AT | 23.11.2005 | CY | 23.11.2005 | BE | 30.11.2005 | MC | 30.11.2005 | LU | 05.12.2005 | BG | 05.01.2006 | DK | 05.01.2006 | GR | 05.01.2006 | SE | 05.01.2006 | ES | 16.01.2006 | PT | 06.03.2006 | [2007/23] |
Former [2007/20] | CZ | 05.10.2005 | |
EE | 05.10.2005 | ||
FI | 05.10.2005 | ||
IE | 05.10.2005 | ||
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
SK | 05.10.2005 | ||
TR | 05.10.2005 | ||
CY | 23.11.2005 | ||
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 05.12.2005 | ||
BG | 05.01.2006 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | CZ | 05.10.2005 | |
EE | 05.10.2005 | ||
FI | 05.10.2005 | ||
IE | 05.10.2005 | ||
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
SK | 05.10.2005 | ||
TR | 05.10.2005 | ||
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 05.12.2005 | ||
BG | 05.01.2006 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | CZ | 05.10.2005 | |
EE | 05.10.2005 | ||
FI | 05.10.2005 | ||
IE | 05.10.2005 | ||
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
SK | 05.10.2005 | ||
TR | 05.10.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 05.12.2005 | ||
BG | 05.01.2006 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | CZ | 05.10.2005 | |
FI | 05.10.2005 | ||
IE | 05.10.2005 | ||
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
SK | 05.10.2005 | ||
TR | 05.10.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
BG | 05.01.2006 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | CZ | 05.10.2005 | |
FI | 05.10.2005 | ||
IE | 05.10.2005 | ||
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
SK | 05.10.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
BG | 05.01.2006 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | CZ | 05.10.2005 | |
FI | 05.10.2005 | ||
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
SK | 05.10.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
GR | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | CZ | 05.10.2005 | |
FI | 05.10.2005 | ||
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
SK | 05.10.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 05.01.2006 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | FI | 05.10.2005 | |
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
ES | 16.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/30] | FI | 05.10.2005 | |
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 05.10.2005 | |
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
SE | 05.01.2006 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 05.10.2005 | |
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
PT | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 05.10.2005 | |
NL | 05.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | NL | 05.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05149366 ; | [A]DE446516 (ETTORE CARETTA) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]DE1132013 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US3046003 (SCHULTZ FORREST O E) [A] 1-10 * column 3, lines 8-11 * * column 3, lines 41-44 * * column 6, lines 30-65; figures 1,2 *; | [DXA]DE2406835 (GOLD HENNING DIPL ING) [DX] 1,7,11,12,14-18,23-26 * figure - * [A] 13,19-22; | [A]US4325541 (KOROSLADANYI JOZSEF, et al) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US4854555 (OHKAWA FUJIO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figure 14 *; | [A]US4934667 (PEES JAMES M [US], et al) [A] 8 * column 6, lines 23-35; figure 8 *; | [A]DE3934821 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931004), vol. 017, no. 548, Database accession no. (M - 1490), & JP05149366 A 19930615 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |