EP1285760 - Method of driving an ink-jet recording head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2006 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/06] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | ||
Former [2003/09] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kitahara, Tsuyoshi c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano, 392 / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Ryoichi c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano, 392 / JP | [2003/09] | Representative(s) | Schorr, Frank Jürgen, et al Diehl & Partner GbR Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/09] | Schorr, Frank, Dr., et al Diehl Glaeser Hiltl & Partner, Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02026531.0 | 10.04.1997 | [2003/09] | Priority number, date | JP19960088464 | 10.04.1996 Original published format: JP 8846496 | JP19960088468 | 10.04.1996 Original published format: JP 8846896 | JP19960272742 | 15.10.1996 Original published format: JP 27274296 | [2003/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1285760 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1285760 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | [2003/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1285760 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/045 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
B41J2/04516 (EP,US);
B41J2/04581 (EP,US);
B41J2/04588 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Ansteuern eines Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungskopfes | [2003/09] | English: | Method of driving an ink-jet recording head | [2003/09] | French: | Procédé de commande d'une tête d'enregistrement à jet d'encre | [2003/09] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/09] | 11.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97915701.3 / EP0841164 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/38] | IT | 08.02.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9534427 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1; | EP0765750 [ ] (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD [JP]) [ ] * figure 1 *; | [X]JPH0671876 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0019] * |