EP1320177 - Circuit board for electric motor and such electric motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Motoren und Aktuatoren GmbH Seewiesenstrasse 2 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2003/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frey, Ronald Talstrasse 19 74357 Bönnigheim / DE | 02 /
Helmich, Johannes Wassersteinchen 2 97877 Wertheim / DE | 03 /
Schmidt, Harald Küferweg 3 74374 Zaberfeld / DE | 04 /
Baeskow, Werner Traminerstrasse 14 74394 Hessigheim / DE | [2003/25] | Representative(s) | Hofmann, Harald, et al Sonnenberg Fortmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 08 65 80068 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | Hofmann, Harald, et al 24IP Law Group Sonnenberg Fortmann Postfach 33 08 65 80068 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/25] | Jahn, Wolf-Diethart Valeo Wischersysteme GmbH, Stuttgarter Strasse 119 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02027040.1 | 03.12.2002 | [2003/25] | Priority number, date | DE2001160845 | 12.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10160845 | [2003/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1320177 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1320177 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H02K11/00 | [2003/25] | CPC: |
H02K11/026 (EP,US);
H02K11/215 (EP,US);
H02K11/25 (EP,US);
H02K11/33 (EP,US);
H02K23/66 (EP,US);
H02K5/148 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19828 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2007/07] |
Former [2003/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Halteplatte für einen Elektromotor und Elektromotor | [2003/25] | English: | Circuit board for electric motor and such electric motor | [2003/25] | French: | Platine pour moteur éléctrique et ce moteur éléctrique | [2003/25] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/25] | 01.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/02] | 12.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2799904 (GATE SPA [IT]) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [X]GB2197136 (LICENTIA GMBH) [X] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]US4110676 (EDICK JOHN D, et al) [A] 5-9 * abstract *; | [A]US2001007401 (WALTHER BERND [DE], et al) [A] 10-12 * abstract * |