EP1317973 - Deep drawing press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2006 [2006/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schuler SMG GmbH & Co. KG Louis-Schuler-Strasse 1 68753 Waghäusel / DE | [2003/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cherek, Hartmut Dr. Maxburgring 39 76756 Bellheim / DE | 02 /
Kolleck, Ralf, Dr. Ahornweg 1 76709 Kronau / DE | 03 /
Palm, Dietrich, Dipl.-Ing. Karl-Millöcker-Strasse 1 76669 Bad Schönborn / DE | [2003/24] | Representative(s) | Lasch, Hartmut, et al LICHTI - Patentanwälte Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/24] | Lasch, Hartmut Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti, Dipl.-Phys.Dr. rer. nat Jost Lempert, Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch, Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 02027116.9 | 04.12.2002 | [2003/24] | Priority number, date | DE2001160410 | 10.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10160410 | [2003/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1317973 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1317973 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B21D22/22 | [2003/24] | CPC: |
B21D22/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/26] |
Former [2003/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Tiefziehpresse | [2003/24] | English: | Deep drawing press | [2003/24] | French: | Presse d'emboutissage profond | [2003/24] | Examination procedure | 07.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/09] | 26.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.05.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.05.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4343336 (DIEFFENBACHER GMBH MASCHF) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9624449 (HECRALMAT ; PIRCHL GERHARD (CH)); | [A]DE19901019 (NIRO PLAN AG ZUG); | [A]EP0835699 (DIEFFENBACHER GMBH MASCHF) |