EP1336484 - Washing device for a cylinder of a printing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2011 | Opposition rejected | published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baldwin Germany GmbH Joseph-Baur-Strasse 2 86316 Friedberg / DE | [2006/45] |
Former [2003/34] | For all designated states Baldwin Germany GmbH Derchinger Strasse 137 86165 Augsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stanka, Herbert Zimmererstrasse 20d 86153 Augsburg / DE | 02 /
Anders, Michael Innsbrucker Strasse 33 86163 Augsburg / DE | [2003/34] | Representative(s) | Trinks, Ole, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/47] | Trinks, Ole, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR P.O. Box 102605 86016 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | Vetter, Ewald Otto, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2003/34] | Vetter, Ewald Otto, Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02027279.5 | 06.12.2002 | [2003/34] | Priority number, date | DE2002106810 | 19.02.2002 Original published format: DE 10206810 | [2003/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1336484 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1336484 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B41F35/00 | [2003/34] | CPC: |
B41F35/00 (EP);
B41P2235/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2003/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Waschvorrichtung für Druckmaschinenzylinder | [2003/34] | English: | Washing device for a cylinder of a printing machine | [2003/34] | French: | Dispositif de lavage d'un cylindre d'une machine à imprimer | [2003/34] | Examination procedure | 13.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 21.02.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.06.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.2007
21.01.2008
ADMISSIBLE manroland AG Mühlheimer Straße 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | [2009/04] |
Former [2008/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.2007
MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Mühlheimer Strasse 341 D- 63075 Offenbach / DE | 07.02.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.05.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M01) | 24.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 24.03.2011 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2011/36] | 24.03.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.04.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.04.2011 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.03.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.03.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06106716 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940719), vol. 018, no. 383, Database accession no. (M - 1640), & JP06106716 A 19940419 (NIPPON BALDWIN KK) [A] 1 * abstract * * the whole document * | by applicant | US4344361 |