EP1320110 - Production process for nanocristalline toroidal cores [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vacuumschmelze GmbH & Co. KG Grüner Weg 37 63450 Hanau / DE | [2003/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Günther, Wulf, Dr. Hauptstrasse 31 63477 Maintal / DE | [2003/25] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | ||
Former [2003/25] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02027302.5 | 06.12.2002 | [2003/25] | Priority number, date | DE2001161907 | 17.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10161907 | [2003/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1320110 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1320110 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01F41/02, H01F1/153 | [2003/25] | CPC: |
H01F1/15341 (EP);
H01F1/15333 (EP);
H01F41/0226 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2004/11] |
Former [2003/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung nanokristalliner Ringbandkerne | [2003/25] | English: | Production process for nanocristalline toroidal cores | [2003/25] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de noyaux toroidales nanocristallins | [2003/25] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 21.12.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.04.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.01.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2000277357 ; | [YA]JPS57186306 ; | [A]JPS58131724 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010205), vol. 2000, no. 13, & JP2000277357 A 20001006 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [Y] 1 * abstract * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830209), vol. 007, no. 033, Database accession no. (E - 157), & JP57186306 A 19821116 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [Y] 1 * abstract * [A] 2,3 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831028), vol. 007, no. 243, Database accession no. (E - 207), & JP58131724 A 19830805 (MATSUSHITA DENKO KK) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |