EP1327541 - Air conditioning device for a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2004/51] |
Former [2003/29] | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burk, Roland, Dipl.-Phys. Bubenhaldenstrasse 86 70469 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Geskes, Peter, Dr. Berthold-Brecht-Strasse 50 70469 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
Klingler, Dietrich, Dipl.-Ing. Richard-Wagner-Strasse 16 73540 Heubach / DE | [2003/29] | Representative(s) | Grauel, Andreas BEHR GmbH & Co., Intellectual Property Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/29] | Grauel, Andreas, Dr. BEHR GmbH & Co., Intellectual Property, Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02027539.2 | 09.12.2002 | [2003/29] | Priority number, date | DE2002100487 | 09.01.2002 Original published format: DE 10200487 | [2003/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1327541 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1327541 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00 | [2003/29] | CPC: |
B60H1/00071 (EP);
B60H2001/00135 (EP);
B60H2001/00185 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/29] | Title | German: | Klimatisierungsanlage eines Fahrzeugs | [2003/29] | English: | Air conditioning device for a vehicle | [2003/29] | French: | Appareil de climatisation d'un véhicule | [2003/29] | Examination procedure | 29.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 12.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.11.2006 | CZ | 22.11.2006 | EE | 22.11.2006 | FI | 22.11.2006 | GB | 22.11.2006 | IE | 22.11.2006 | IT | 22.11.2006 | NL | 22.11.2006 | SI | 22.11.2006 | SK | 22.11.2006 | TR | 22.11.2006 | AT | 09.12.2006 | LU | 09.12.2006 | BE | 31.12.2006 | CH | 31.12.2006 | LI | 31.12.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | BG | 22.02.2007 | DK | 22.02.2007 | SE | 22.02.2007 | GR | 23.02.2007 | ES | 05.03.2007 | PT | 23.04.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 22.11.2006 | |
EE | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
GB | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
TR | 22.11.2006 | ||
AT | 09.12.2006 | ||
LU | 09.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
CH | 31.12.2006 | ||
LI | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 22.11.2006 | |
EE | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
GB | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
AT | 09.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
CH | 31.12.2006 | ||
LI | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | CZ | 22.11.2006 | |
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
GB | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
AT | 09.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
CH | 31.12.2006 | ||
LI | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | CZ | 22.11.2006 | |
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
GB | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
AT | 09.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
CH | 31.12.2006 | ||
LI | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | CZ | 22.11.2006 | |
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
GB | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
CH | 31.12.2006 | ||
LI | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | CZ | 22.11.2006 | |
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
CH | 31.12.2006 | ||
LI | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | CZ | 22.11.2006 | |
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | CZ | 22.11.2006 | |
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CZ | 22.11.2006 | |
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | CZ | 22.11.2006 | |
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | FI | 22.11.2006 | |
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 22.11.2006 | |
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH01247210 ; | [X]JPS5551615 ; | [X]DE1001907 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [X] 1,2,4,6-8,12-16,18 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 33; figures 1,3 *; | [A]DE1942938 (SUEDDEUTSCHE KUEHLER BEHR) [A] 5* page 5 - page 6; figure 1 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891225), vol. 013, no. 588, Database accession no. (M - 912), & JP01247210 A 19891003 (NISSAN SHATAI CO LTD) [X] 1,3,4,6-9,13-19 * abstract * [A] 10,11 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800708), vol. 004, no. 094, Database accession no. (M - 019), & JP55051615 A 19800415 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP;OTHERS: 01) [X] 1,3,4,6-9,13-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0027]; figure 9 * |