EP1329564 - Dowel connector for concrete layers and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TECNARIA S.p.A Viale P. Giraldi, 55 int. C. 36061 Bassano del Grappa Vicenza / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/30] | For all designated states TECNARIA S.p.A Viale P. Giraldi, 55 int. C. 36061 Bassano del Grappa, Vicenza / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guazzo, Marco Via Ca'Morosini, 26 36061 Bassano del Grappa (Vicenza) / IT | [2003/30] | Representative(s) | Bettello, Pietro, et al Studio Tecnico Ing. Pietro Bettello Via Col d'Echele, 25 36100 Vicenza / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/30] | Bettello, Pietro, Dott. Ing., et al Via Col d'Echele, 25 36100 Vicenza / IT | Application number, filing date | 02027543.4 | 09.12.2002 | [2003/30] | Priority number, date | IT2002VI00008 | 18.01.2002 Original published format: IT VI20020008 | [2003/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1329564 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1329564 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/48, E04B1/41, F16B35/04 | [2003/30] | CPC: |
F16B43/00 (EP);
E04B1/483 (EP);
F16B35/041 (EP);
F16B41/002 (EP);
F16B39/108 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/24] |
Former [2004/16] | |||
Former [2003/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dübel für die Verbindung von Betonschichten und seine Verwendung | [2003/30] | English: | Dowel connector for concrete layers and its use | [2003/30] | French: | Connecteur à cheville pour les couches de béton et son utilisation | [2003/30] | Examination procedure | 09.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 28.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.03.2004 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   09.04.2004 | 04.03.2004 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   09.04.2004 | 04.03.2004 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   09.04.2004 | 04.03.2004 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   09.04.2004 | 04.03.2004 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   09.04.2004 | 04.03.2004 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   09.04.2004 | 04.03.2004 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   09.04.2004 | 04.03.2004 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   09.04.2004 | 04.03.2004 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   09.04.2004 | 04.03.2004 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   09.04.2004 | 04.03.2004 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   09.04.2004 | 04.03.2004 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   09.04.2004 | 04.03.2004 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   09.04.2004 | 04.03.2004 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   09.04.2004 | 04.03.2004 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   09.04.2004 | 04.03.2004 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   09.04.2004 | 04.03.2004 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   09.04.2004 | 04.03.2004 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   09.04.2004 | 04.03.2004 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   09.04.2004 | 04.03.2004 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   09.04.2004 | 04.03.2004 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   09.04.2004 | 04.03.2004 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   09.04.2004 | 04.03.2004 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   09.04.2004 | 04.03.2004 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   09.04.2004 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.03.2004 | M01   Fee paid on   09.04.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.06.2005 | BE | 15.06.2005 | CH | 15.06.2005 | CZ | 15.06.2005 | EE | 15.06.2005 | FI | 15.06.2005 | FR | 15.06.2005 | LI | 15.06.2005 | NL | 15.06.2005 | SI | 15.06.2005 | SK | 15.06.2005 | TR | 15.06.2005 | BG | 15.09.2005 | DK | 15.09.2005 | GR | 15.09.2005 | SE | 15.09.2005 | DE | 16.09.2005 | ES | 26.09.2005 | PT | 24.11.2005 | CY | 09.12.2005 | IE | 09.12.2005 | LU | 31.12.2005 | MC | 31.12.2005 | [2009/01] |
Former [2007/20] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2005 | ||
EE | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SK | 15.06.2005 | ||
TR | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
DE | 16.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
CY | 09.12.2005 | ||
IE | 09.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2005 | ||
EE | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SK | 15.06.2005 | ||
TR | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
DE | 16.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
IE | 09.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SK | 15.06.2005 | ||
TR | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
DE | 16.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
IE | 09.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SK | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
DE | 16.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
IE | 09.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SK | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
DE | 16.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SK | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
DE | 16.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SK | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
ES | 26.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SI | 15.06.2005 | ||
BG | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 15.06.2005 | |
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 15.09.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR539750 (POTTERAT LOUIS) [A] 1-3 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5428936 (ROTH STEVEN A [US]) [A] * figure 10 *; | [A]US5649798 (ITO KATSUO [JP]) [A] 1-3 * figure 9 *; | [A]EP1041208 (TECNARIA S P A [IT]) [A] 1-3 * figures 1,2; claim 1 * |