EP1320065 - Index sheet preparation for a multipage document [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oki Data Corporation 11-22, Shibaura 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8551 / JP | [2016/37] |
Former [2003/25] | For all designated states Oki Data Corporation 11-22, Shibaura 4-Chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8551 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishizaki, Koji Oki Data Corporation 11-22, Shibaura 4-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-8551 / JP | [2016/37] |
Former [2003/25] | 01 /
Ishizaki, Koji Oki Data Corporation, 11-22, Shibaura 4-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-8551 / JP | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2016/37] |
Former [2003/25] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte, Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02027637.4 | 11.12.2002 | [2003/25] | Priority number, date | JP20010377710 | 11.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001377710 | [2003/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1320065 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1320065 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | [2005/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1320065 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06K15/02 | [2003/25] | CPC: |
G06K15/02 (EP,US);
G06K2215/0082 (EP,US);
G06K2215/0088 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2016/37] |
Former [2005/43] | DE, FR, GB, NL | ||
Former [2003/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorbereitung eines Indexblattes für ein mehrseitiges Dokument | [2003/25] | English: | Index sheet preparation for a multipage document | [2003/25] | French: | Préparation d'une feuille d'index pour un document multipage | [2003/25] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 12.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.04.2006 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6188490 (MIYAKE KIYOSHI [JP]) [A] 1-5,12-21,28-32 * column 3, line 21 - column 6, line 36 *; | [XA]EP1098266 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,12,17,18,28-32 * abstract * * column 16, line 46 - column 22, line 53 * * column 27, line 13 - column 30, line 19 * * figures 8-14,22,31-36 * [A] 3-5,13-16,19-21; | [A]US6301013 (MOMOSE HIROAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5,12-21,28-32 * column 11, line 6 - column 18, line 57 ** figure 8 * | Examination | JPH11136496 |