EP1297958 - Drop-on-demand ink-jet printing head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Usui, Minoru c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | 02 /
Koto, Haruhiko c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | 03 /
Nakamura, Haruo c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | 04 /
Shimada, Yozo c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | 05 /
Abe, Tomoaki c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | [2003/14] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Diehl & Partner Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/14] | DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02027777.8 | 25.02.1991 | [2003/14] | Priority number, date | JP19900043787 | 23.02.1990 Original published format: JP 4378790 | JP19900337278 | 30.11.1990 Original published format: JP 33727890 | [2003/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1297958 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1297958 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/14 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
B41J2/1623 (EP,US);
B41J2/14274 (EP,US);
B41J2/14282 (EP,US);
B41J2/161 (EP,US);
B41J2/1612 (EP,US);
B41J2/1614 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/14] | Title | German: | Auf Abruf arbeitender Tintenstrahldruckkopf | [2003/14] | English: | Drop-on-demand ink-jet printing head | [2003/14] | French: | Tête d'impression jet d'encre générant des gouttelettes sur demande | [2003/14] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 15.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00118028.0 / EP1055519 | EP01130656.0 / EP1208983 | EP91102760.5 / EP0443628 | EP92112945.8 / EP0516188 | EP95102020.5 / EP0655333 | EP98112293.0 / EP0873872 | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 24.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 26.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4443729 (RIDER BILLIE F [US]) [A] 1,4 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 10 - line 43 *; | [DA]US4566018 (NILSSON KENTH [SE]) [DA] 1,4 * abstract *; | [A]JPS63128778 (NEC CORP) [A] 1 * figures 5,6 *; | [A]US4752789 (MALTSEV VIACHESLAV B [US]) [A] 1,4* abstract *; | [A]US4788557 (HOWKINS STUART [US]) [A] 4 * figures 2-4 * * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 4 * * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 8 * | Examination | US4418355 | JPS6090770 | by applicant | US4418355 |