EP1293165 - Surgical retractor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United States Surgical Corporation 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk Connecticut 06856 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states United States Surgical Corporation 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk Connecticut 06856 / US | ||
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states United States Surgical Corporation 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06856 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sherts, Charles R. 443 Riverside Avenue Westport, CT 06880 / US | 02 /
Ratcliff, Keith 14 Concorde Ridge Newtown, CT 06470 / US | 03 /
Nicholas, David A. 148 Cottage Street Trumbull, CT 06611 / US | 04 /
Robertson, John Charles 860 South Meriden Road Cheshire, CT 06410 / US | 05 /
Farascioni, David 30 Deepwood Drive Bethel, CT 06801 / US | 06 /
Alesi, Daniel E. 237 Patriot Road Southbury, CT 06488 / US | 07 /
Flanagan, Patrick M. 142 Sixth Avenue Stratford, CT 06497 / US | [2003/23] |
Former [2003/12] | 01 /
Sherts, Charles R. 443 Riverside Avenue Westport, CT 06880 / US | ||
02 /
Ratcliff, Keith 14 Concorde Ridge Newtown, CT 06470 / US | |||
03 /
Nicholas, David A. 148 Cottage Street Trumbull, CT 06611 / US | |||
04 /
Robertson, John Charles 24 Maple Avenue Bloomfield, CT 06002 / US | |||
05 /
Farascioni, David 30 Deepwood Drive Bethel, CT 06801 / US | |||
06 /
Alesi, Daniel E. 38 Route 39 North Sherman, CT 06784 / US | |||
07 /
Flanagan, Patrick M. 142 Sixth Avenue Stratford, CT 06497 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02028064.0 | 25.04.1997 | [2003/12] | Priority number, date | US19960718283 | 20.09.1996 Original published format: US 718283 | US19960016325P | 26.04.1996 Original published format: US 16325 P | [2003/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1293165 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1293165 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/02 | [2003/12] | CPC: |
A61B17/0293 (EP,US);
A61M1/77 (EP,US);
A61B17/12 (EP);
A61B17/1325 (EP);
A61B2017/00243 (EP);
A61B2017/0237 (EP);
A61B2017/0243 (EP);
A61B2017/2905 (EP);
A61B2090/306 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/12] | Title | German: | Chirurgischer Retraktor | [2003/12] | English: | Surgical retractor | [2003/12] | French: | Ecarteur chirurgical | [2003/12] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/25] | 02.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97106913.3 / EP0803228 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/38] | IT | 26.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2510198 (TESMER EARL B) [X] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [X]US3858578 (MILO SIMCHA) [X] 1,4,15-17 * abstract *; | [A]US3965890 (GAUTHIER WILLIAM KOHLMANN) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US4048987 (HURSON JAMES KEVIN) [A] * abstract * * column 6, line 61 *; | [A]US4190042 (SINNREICH MANFRED [US]) [A] * abstract * * column 2, line 58 *; | [X]US4457300 (BUDDE RICHARD B [US]) [X] 1,4,15 * abstract *; | [XY]EP0167345 (MICRA LTD [GB]) [X] 1,5 * abstract * * page 3, line 25 - page 6, line 5 * [Y] 11,13,14; | [XAY]DE8702192U (PAPENTICO LTD.) [X] 1-4,15-17 * the whole document * [A] 23,26,27 [Y] 11,13,14; | [A]EP0246086 (KLEIMAN ALDO SERGIO) [A] * column 5, lines 8-16; figure 1 *; | [A]US4744363 (HASSON HARRITH M [US]) [A] * column 1, line 35 - column 2, line 10 *; | [A]WO8904145 (MINNESOTA SCIENTIFIC INC [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US5167223 (KOROS TIBOR [US], et al) [A] * column 6, line 66 - column 7, line 24; figures 1,23,24 *; | [A]WO9221296 (GIGLIO STEVEN R [US], et al) [A] * figures 1,6-8,10,11 * | by applicant | US5025779 | WO9515715 | US5503617 |