EP1329388 - Method and apparatus for removing an overwrapping from cigarette packages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states British American Tobacco (Germany) GmbH Alsterufer 4 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2006/23] |
Former [2003/30] | For all designated states British American Tobacco (Germany) GmbH Alsterufer 4 20354 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fuchs, Hans-Werner Am Petershof 5 95349 Thurnau / DE | 02 /
Rabenstein, Bernd Cottenbach 13 95500 Heinersreuth / DE | 03 /
Witzke, Friedrich G. Dörfls 2 95336 Mainleus / DE | [2003/30] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/30] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02028162.2 | 19.12.2002 | [2003/30] | Priority number, date | DE20021002271 | 22.01.2002 Original published format: DE 10202271 | [2003/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1329388 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1329388 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65B69/00 | [2003/30] | CPC: |
B65B69/0033 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Ablösen einer Umverpackung von Zigarettenverpackungen | [2003/30] | English: | Method and apparatus for removing an overwrapping from cigarette packages | [2003/30] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour détacher un suremballage de paquets de cigarettes | [2003/30] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 08.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.06.2006 | CZ | 07.06.2006 | EE | 07.06.2006 | FI | 07.06.2006 | FR | 07.06.2006 | IE | 07.06.2006 | NL | 07.06.2006 | SI | 07.06.2006 | SK | 07.06.2006 | TR | 07.06.2006 | BG | 07.09.2006 | DK | 07.09.2006 | SE | 07.09.2006 | GR | 08.09.2006 | ES | 18.09.2006 | PT | 07.11.2006 | AT | 19.12.2006 | LU | 19.12.2006 | BE | 31.12.2006 | CH | 31.12.2006 | LI | 31.12.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 07.06.2006 | |
EE | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
TR | 07.06.2006 | ||
BG | 07.09.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
AT | 19.12.2006 | ||
LU | 19.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
CH | 31.12.2006 | ||
LI | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | CZ | 07.06.2006 | |
EE | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
BG | 07.09.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
AT | 19.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
CH | 31.12.2006 | ||
LI | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 07.06.2006 | |
EE | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
AT | 19.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
CH | 31.12.2006 | ||
LI | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | CZ | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
AT | 19.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
CH | 31.12.2006 | ||
LI | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/13] | CZ | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
AT | 19.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
CH | 31.12.2006 | ||
LI | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/48] | CZ | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
CH | 31.12.2006 | ||
LI | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | CZ | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | CZ | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CZ | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CZ | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | CZ | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 07.09.2006 | |
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 07.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5275523 (STEWART IAIN [DE], et al); | [Y]US5476354 (CRAIN WALLACE O [US], et al) [Y] 1-8,16 * column 3, line 3 - column 6, line 49; figure - *; | [A]DE19505260 (KOEHL MASCHBAU GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0731029 (KAO CORP [JP]); | [Y]EP0864501 (BALDWIN NIPPON KK [JP]) [Y] 1-8,16 * column 10, line 11 - column 11, line 13; figures 13-17 * |