EP1329561 - Wastewater pipe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.12.2007 [2007/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TG KUNSTSTOFFVERARBEITUNG GmbH Industriestrasse 1-7 57339 Erndtebrück / DE | [2003/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grebe, Herbert Breslauer Strasse 8 57339 Erndtebrück / DE | [2003/30] | Representative(s) | Grosse, Wolf-Dietrich Rüdiger, et al Gihske Grosse Klüppel Kross Bürogemeinschaft von Patentanwälten Hammerstrasse 3 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | Grosse, Wolf-Dietrich Rüdiger, et al Valentin, Gihske, Grosse Patentanwälte Hammerstrasse 3 57072 Siegen / DE | ||
Former [2003/30] | Grosse, Wolf-Dietrich, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse, Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02028213.3 | 14.12.2002 | [2003/30] | Priority number, date | DE2002200461U | 11.01.2002 Original published format: DE 20200461 U | [2003/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1329561 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1329561 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | [2005/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16L25/00 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
E03C1/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/30] | E03C1/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/30] | Title | German: | Abwasserleitung | [2003/30] | English: | Wastewater pipe | [2003/30] | French: | Conduit pour eaux usées | [2003/30] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 06.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/51] | 06.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1816967U (KUNSTSTOFFWERK GEBR ANGER & CO [DE]) [A] 4,5* the whole document *; | [XA]DE1188515 (WILHELM KOETZNER) [X] 1,3,5 * the whole document * [A] 2,8; | [XA]DE2633678 (OMNIPLAST GMBH & CO) [X] 1-3,5 * the whole document * [A] 7,8; | [Y]DE29613921U (TRUPLAST KUNSTSTOFFTECHNIK [DE]) [Y] 4,6,7 * the whole document *; | [XAY]EP1046851 (EUREKA IMMOBILIARE S R L [IT]) [X] 1-3,5 * the whole document * [A] 8 [Y] 4,6,7 |