EP1339166 - Direct conversion receivers and methods therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [2003/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vannatta, Louis 4712 Wild Cherry Road Crystal Lake, Illinois 60012 / US | 02 /
Haub, Daniel 891 Taralon Trail Lake in the Hills, Illinois 60156 / US | 03 /
Solar, John 1415 Brandywine Circle Algonquin, Illinois 60102 / US | [2003/35] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2004/49] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2003/35] | Litchfield, Laura Marie, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations, Midpoint - Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02028217.4 | 16.12.2002 | [2003/35] | Priority number, date | US20010033999 | 20.12.2001 Original published format: US 33999 | [2003/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1339166 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1339166 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | [2004/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1339166 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H03D3/00 | [2003/35] | CPC: |
H04B1/71 (EP,US);
H04B1/1036 (EP,US);
H04B17/336 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/35] | Title | German: | Direktkonversionsempfänger und Verfahren dazu | [2003/35] | English: | Direct conversion receivers and methods therefor | [2003/35] | French: | Récepteur à conversion directe et procédé | [2003/35] | Examination procedure | 21.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 06.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 05.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/22] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 05.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 05.05.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.05.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.06.2008 | BE | 18.06.2008 | CY | 18.06.2008 | CZ | 18.06.2008 | DK | 18.06.2008 | EE | 18.06.2008 | FI | 18.06.2008 | IT | 18.06.2008 | NL | 18.06.2008 | SI | 18.06.2008 | SK | 18.06.2008 | TR | 18.06.2008 | BG | 18.09.2008 | SE | 18.09.2008 | GR | 19.09.2008 | ES | 29.09.2008 | PT | 18.11.2008 | IE | 16.12.2008 | LU | 16.12.2008 | CH | 31.12.2008 | LI | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
CY | 18.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
TR | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
IE | 16.12.2008 | ||
LU | 16.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
CY | 18.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
IE | 16.12.2008 | ||
LU | 16.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
IE | 16.12.2008 | ||
LU | 16.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
IE | 16.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 18.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5179730 (LOPER ROGER K [US]) [A] 1-27 * column 4, line 52 - column 8, line 14; figure 3 *; | [X]US6047171 (KHAYRALLAH ALI S [US], et al) [X] 1-27 * column 2, line 46 - column 7, line 31; figures 2-6 *; | [DA]US6125272 (BAUTISTA EDWIN E [US], et al) [DA] 1-27* figure 2 *; | [X]US6178314 (WHIKEHART J WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1-27 * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 44; figures 3-6 *; | [DA]US6192225 (ARPAIA DOMENICO [US], et al) [DA] 1-27 * column 3, line 20 - column 5, line 20; figure 2 *; | [X] - "DAS DYNAS-EMPFANGSKONZEPT", RADIO FERNSEHEN ELEKTRONIK, VEB VERLAG TECHNIK. BERLIN, DE, (1992), vol. 41, no. 2, ISSN 1436-1574, pages 88,89 - 90, XP000288667 [X] 1-27 * page 89, column 1, line 29 - page 90, column 3, line 38; figures 3,4 * |