EP1320060 - Printing device for personal medical monitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/25] | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417-1880 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gordon, Tim H. 830 Blauvelt Street River Vale, New Jersey 07675 / US | 02 /
Gisler, Scott W. 3100 Rachel Terrace, No.1 Pine Brook, New Jersey 07058 / US | 03 /
Puma, Michael 118 Park Avenue Midland Park, New Jersey 07432 / US | 04 /
Yao, Raymond L. 517 Bloomfield Street, No.4 Hoboken, New Jersey 07030 / US | 05 /
Cassigneul, Pierre 8 Haven Hill Rise Flemington, New Jersey 08822 / US | [2003/25] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2003/25] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 02028252.1 | 16.12.2002 | [2003/25] | Priority number, date | US20010339809P | 17.12.2001 Original published format: US 339809 P | US20020316679P | 11.12.2002 Original published format: US 316679 P | [2003/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1320060 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1320060 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01L99/00 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
G01N33/48792 (EP,US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
G16H10/40 (EP,US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/25] | G06F19/00, B01L11/00, G01N33/487 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/11] |
Former [2003/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Drucker für persönnliches medizinisches Messgerät | [2003/25] | English: | Printing device for personal medical monitors | [2003/25] | French: | Imprimante pour moniteur medical personnel | [2003/25] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 22.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.04.2008 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3502438 (NATELSON SAMUEL) [X] 1,4 * column 2, line 32 - column 5, line 28; figures 1,3 *; | [X]WO9419684 (DIAMETRICS MEDICAL INC [US]) [X] 1 * page 9, line 22 - page 10, line 9; claim 1 *; | [X]DE19546535 (INST CHEMO BIOSENSORIK [DE]) [X] 1 * claim 1 *; | [X]WO0028460 (LIFESTREAM TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1* page 16, line 19 - page 23, line 22 * |