EP1297888 - Apparatus for the preparation of polymer solution [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210,Nakanuma, Minami-ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamazaki, Hidekazu c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Tsujimoto, Tadahiro c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Katai, Yukihiro c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2003/14] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02028839.5 | 04.12.1996 | [2003/14] | Priority number, date | JP19950344614 | 05.12.1995 Original published format: JP 34461495 | JP19960216769 | 30.07.1996 Original published format: JP 21676996 | [2003/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1297888 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1297888 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | [2005/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B01F1/00, B01F13/10, B29B7/74, B29B7/82 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
B29B7/7461 (EP,US);
B01F21/00 (EP,US);
B01F21/02 (EP,US);
B01F21/30 (EP,US);
B01F33/821 (EP,US);
B01F35/71705 (EP,US);
B29B7/726 (EP,US);
B29B7/7476 (EP,US);
B29B7/823 (EP,US);
B29B7/826 (EP,US);
C08J3/11 (EP,US);
B01F2035/98 (EP,US);
B01F2035/99 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2003/14] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Herstellung einer Polymerlösung | [2003/14] | English: | Apparatus for the preparation of polymer solution | [2003/14] | French: | Appareil pour la préparation d'une solution d'un polymère | [2003/14] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 21.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/52] | 09.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/52] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96119456.0 / EP0779321 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19960119456) is 25.05.1999 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS62164521 ; | [A]US2541113 (SMITH JR HORACE L, et al) [A] 1-10,13-18,22,23,28,30-32 * column 6, line 15 - line 61; figure 1a *; | [A]FR1122854 (KUREHA KASEI CO LTD) [A] 1,3,4,22 * page 2, column 2; figure 1 *; | [XA]US3296043 (FLUKE GORDON A, et al) [X] 1-21 * column 3, line 40 - line 49 * * column 3, line 66 - line 73 * * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 16; figure 1 * [A] 22-24,27,28,30-32; | [A]GB1175635 (WERNER & PFLEIDERER [DE]) [A] 1,3,4,10,22 * page 2, line 57 - line 130; figure . *; | [A]US3551535 (HENDERSON WILLIAM E, et al) [A] 1,3 * column 10; example 9 *; | [A]US3726648 (WEBER W, et al) [A] 1-14,17,18,22,23,28,30-32 * column 3, line 36 - column 5, line 23; figure - *; | [A]US3738409 (SKIDMORE R) [A] 1,3,4,8-10,13-22 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 68; figure 1 *; | [A]US3860220 (MATSUBAYASHI SABURO, et al) [A] 1,3,4,8,14 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 23; figure 1 *; | [A]US3977658 (WITTROCK LUDWIG, et al) [A] 22 * column 4, line 26 - line 50; figure 1 *; | [A]US4028302 (TYNAN DANIEL GREGORY) [A] 1,3-14 * column 3, line 37 - line 53; figure 1 *; | [A]US4310663 (HILBIG JOSEF, et al) [A] 1-10,22,23,28,30-32 * column 6, line 3 - line 31 * * column 9, line 47 - column 11, line 20; figure . *; | [A]EP0080583 (BATTENFELD EXTRUSIONSTECH [DE]) [A] 22* page 4; figure . * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871225), vol. 011, no. 397, Database accession no. (M - 655), & JP62164521 A 19870721 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEM CO LTD) [A] 22 * abstract * | by applicant | US3296043 | - J.M.G. COWIE ET AL., MAKROMOL., CHEM., (1971), vol. 143, pages 105 - 114 | - K. KAMIDE ET AL., TEXTILE MACHINERY SOCIETY, (1981), vol. 34, pages 57 - 61 |