EP1300248 - Ink cartridge and remaining ink volume detection method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | ||
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 15-1 Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasaki, Toyonori D-805, 2-1-1, Imaike-cho Anjou-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [2003/15] | Representative(s) | Smith, Samuel Leonard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | Smith, Samuel Leonard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02029048.2 | 30.03.1999 | [2003/15] | Priority number, date | JP19980084037 | 30.03.1998 Original published format: JP 8403798 | JP19980094772 | 07.04.1998 Original published format: JP 9477298 | JP19980094773 | 07.04.1998 Original published format: JP 9477398 | JP19980094774 | 07.04.1998 Original published format: JP 9477498 | JP19980094775 | 07.04.1998 Original published format: JP 9477598 | JP19980094776 | 07.04.1998 Original published format: JP 9477698 | JP19980094777 | 07.04.1998 Original published format: JP 9477798 | JP19980094778 | 07.04.1998 Original published format: JP 9477898 | JP19980146993 | 28.05.1998 Original published format: JP 14699398 | JP19980166920 | 15.06.1998 Original published format: JP 16692098 | JP19990028320 | 05.02.1999 Original published format: JP 2832099 | [2003/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1300248 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1300248 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | [2007/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1300248 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175 | [2003/15] | CPC: |
B41J2/17513 (EP);
B41J2/17553 (EP);
B41J2/17566 (EP);
B41J2002/17573 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [2003/15] | Title | German: | Tintenpatrone und Verfahren zur Detektion der restlichen Tintenmenge | [2003/15] | English: | Ink cartridge and remaining ink volume detection method | [2003/15] | French: | Cartouche d'encre et procédé de détection du volume d'encre restant | [2003/15] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/23] | 25.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99302481.9 / EP0947328 | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 22.01.2009 | [2009/38] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0375383 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]); | [X]EP0542247 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1 * page 6, line 29 - line 40; figures 5-7 *; | [X]EP0631874 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-14 * column 14, line 47 - line 53; figure 8a *; | [A]DE4328001 (DIA NIELSEN GMBH [DE]); | [X]EP0765756 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-14 * page 11, line 41 - line 52; figure 4 * * page 12, line 49 - page 13, line 3; figure 13 * * page 12, line 13 - line 20; figure 7 * * page 14, line 28 - line 42; figure 16a *; | [X]EP0791464 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 33 - line 55; figures 1a,6 *; | [X]JPH10787 (MINOLTA CO LTD) [X] 1-14 * abstract * |