EP1227442 - 2D image processing applied to 3D objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2005 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2019 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duquesnois, Laurent, Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [2004/10] |
Former [2002/31] | 01 /
Dequesnois, Laurent, Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Chaffraix, Jean Société Civile SPID, 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | Chaffraix, Jean Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02075253.1 | 22.01.2002 | [2002/31] | Priority number, date | FR20010001237 | 30.01.2001 Original published format: FR 0101237 | [2002/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1227442 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1227442 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/20 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
G06T15/04 (EP,US);
G06T19/20 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/31] | Title | German: | Auf 3D Objekten angewendetes 2D Bildverarbeitungsverfahren | [2002/31] | English: | 2D image processing applied to 3D objects | [2002/31] | French: | Procédé de traitement d'images en 2D appliquées sur des objets en 3D | [2004/10] |
Former [2002/31] | Procédé- de traitement d'images en 2D appliquées sur des objets en 3D | Examination procedure | 31.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 29.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.10.2004 | FI | 27.10.2004 | IE | 27.10.2004 | IT | 27.10.2004 | NL | 27.10.2004 | TR | 27.10.2004 | CY | 22.01.2005 | LU | 22.01.2005 | DK | 27.01.2005 | GR | 27.01.2005 | SE | 27.01.2005 | BE | 31.01.2005 | MC | 31.01.2005 | ES | 07.02.2005 | PT | 27.03.2005 | [2019/49] |
Former [2008/03] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
IE | 27.10.2004 | ||
IT | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
TR | 27.10.2004 | ||
CY | 22.01.2005 | ||
LU | 22.01.2005 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
SE | 27.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
PT | 27.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
IE | 27.10.2004 | ||
IT | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
TR | 27.10.2004 | ||
CY | 22.01.2005 | ||
LU | 22.01.2005 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
SE | 27.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
IE | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
TR | 27.10.2004 | ||
CY | 22.01.2005 | ||
LU | 22.01.2005 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
SE | 27.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
IE | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
TR | 27.10.2004 | ||
LU | 22.01.2005 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
SE | 27.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
IE | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
TR | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
IE | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
IE | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/03] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
IE | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
DE | 28.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
IE | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | FI | 27.10.2004 | |
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
ES | 07.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 27.10.2004 | |
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 27.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5333245 (VECCHIONE MAURIZIO [US]) [A] 1,2* column 2, line 10 - column 4, line 35 * |