EP1342802 - Process for the recovery of elemental sulphur from slurries containing metal sulphides and elemental sulphur [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paques B.V. P.O. Box 52 T. de Boerstraat 11-13 NL-8560 AB Balk / NL | [2003/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buisman, Cees Jan Nico Stinsenwei 1 8571 RH Harich / NL | 02 /
Picavet, Merijn Amilcare Rode Klaver 49 8607 EJ Sneek / NL | [2003/37] | Representative(s) | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2003/37] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 02075908.0 | 08.03.2002 | [2003/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1342802 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C22B3/18 | [2003/37] | CPC: |
C02F3/345 (EP);
C22B13/04 (EP);
C22B13/045 (EP);
C22B3/18 (EP);
C02F2301/043 (EP);
Y02P10/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/23] |
Former [2003/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Rückgewinnung von Elementarschwefel aus Schlämme beinhaltend Metallsulfide und Elementarschwefel | [2003/37] | English: | Process for the recovery of elemental sulphur from slurries containing metal sulphides and elemental sulphur | [2003/37] | French: | Procédé de récupération de soufre élémentaire à partir de boues contenant des sulfures métalliques et du soufre élémentaire | [2003/37] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/50] | 06.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.04.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.04.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.04.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.04.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.04.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.04.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.04.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.04.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.04.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.04.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 20.04.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.04.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.04.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.04.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.04.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.04.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.04.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.04.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.04.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.04.2004 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO9429227 (PACQUES BV [NL], et al) [AD] 1-9 * Claims; p.4, l.18-28 *; | [A]WO9729055 (THIOPAQ SULFUR SYSTEMS B V [NL], et al) [A] 1-9* Claims; p.4, l.4-22 *; | [AD]WO0029605 (PAQUES BIO SYST BV [NL], et al) [AD] 1-9 * Claim 1; p.3, l.22-26 *; | [A]EP1114873 (PAQUES BIO SYST BV [NL]) [A] 1-9 * Claim 1; col.2, l.14-48 * |