EP1248008 - Magnetorheological fluid stopper at electric motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2002/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Menjak, Ratko 507 E.Franconian Drive Frankenmuth, MI 48734 / US | 02 /
Card, James M. 2700 North East 47th Street Lighthouse Point, FL 33064 / US | 03 /
Gillman, Stephen V. 204 N. Mackinaw Road Linwood, MI 48634 / US | [2002/41] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | Denton, Michael John Delphi Automotive Systems, Centre Technique Paris, 117, avenue des Nations, B.P. 60059 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 02075975.9 | 13.03.2002 | [2002/41] | Priority number, date | US20010825793 | 04.04.2001 Original published format: US 825793 | [2002/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1248008 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16D63/00 | [2002/41] | CPC: |
F16D57/002 (EP,US);
B62D5/04 (EP,US);
B62D5/0475 (EP,US);
H02K7/1021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/27] |
Former [2002/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Magnetorheologische Bremse für elektrischen Motor | [2002/41] | English: | Magnetorheological fluid stopper at electric motor | [2002/41] | French: | Frein à fluide magnétorhéologique pour moteur électrique | [2002/41] | Examination procedure | 09.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 21.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/51] | 16.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/51] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1058320 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2248741 (STIEN GEORGES [FR]) [X] 1-27* page 2, line 30 - line 31; figure . *; | [X]EP0356145 (LORD CORP [US]) [X] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [X]US5842547 (CARLSON J DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-27 * the whole document * |