EP1245299 - Card cleaning device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZIH Corp. 1201 Market Street, Suite 1500 Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/40] | For all designated states ZIH Corp. 1201 Market Street, Suite 1500 Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heno, Gaetan 670 rue du Terte 44150 Ancenis / FR | [2002/40] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al Castles 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/40] | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al Castles, 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02076110.2 | 21.03.2002 | [2002/40] | Priority number, date | US20010822692 | 30.03.2001 Original published format: US 822692 | US20010010222 | 06.12.2001 Original published format: US 10222 | [2002/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1245299 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B08B7/00, B08B1/02, B41J29/17, B41J13/00 | [2002/40] | CPC: |
B41J29/17 (EP,US);
B08B7/0028 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00523 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00708 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/26] |
Former [2002/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Kartenreinigung | [2002/40] | English: | Card cleaning device | [2002/40] | French: | Dispositif de nettoyage de cartes | [2002/40] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 18.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/02] | 05.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5989358 (KORBONSKI JOHN A [US]); | [LPX]US6285845 (LIATARD YVES [FR], et al) [LPX] 1-15 * the whole document * |