EP1348464 - After loader apparatus, cartridge as well as a device for exchanging an after loader cartridge. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/40] | After loader apparatus as well as a device for exchanging an after loader cartridge. | ||
[2004/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nucletron B.V. Waardgelder 1 3905 TH Veenendaal / NL | [2003/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kindlein, Johann Liricherstr. 153F 46049 Oberhausen / DE | 02 /
van Krieken, Frits Zutphensestraatweg 36 6953 CL Dieren / NL | 03 /
Visscher, Arie Luite Verheullaan 13 3971 RD Driebergen / NL | [2005/18] |
Former [2003/40] | 01 /
Kindlein, Johann Lirichstr. 153F 46049 Oberhausen / DE | ||
02 /
van Krieken, Frits Zutphensestraatweg 36 6953 CL Dieren / NL | |||
03 /
Visscher, Arie Luite Verheullaan 13 3971 RD Driebergen / NL | Representative(s) | Valkonet, Rutger, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Valkonet, Rutger, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2003/40] | Valkonet, Rutger, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 02076190.4 | 27.03.2002 | [2003/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1348464 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1348464 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10 | [2003/40] | CPC: |
G21F5/015 (EP,US);
A61N5/1007 (EP,US);
A61N2005/1008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/40] | Title | German: | Nachladegerät, Kassette und Einrichtung zum Auswechseln einer Nachladekassette | [2004/51] | English: | After loader apparatus, cartridge as well as a device for exchanging an after loader cartridge. | [2004/51] | French: | Appareil projecteur de sources, cassette et dispositif pour changer une cassette à sources | [2004/51] |
Former [2003/40] | Nachladegerät und Einrichtung zum Auswechseln einer Nachladekassette | ||
Former [2003/40] | After loader apparatus as well as a device for exchanging an after loader cartridge. | ||
Former [2003/40] | Appareil projecteur de sources et dispositif pour changer une cassette à sources | Examination procedure | 24.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 22.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.05.2005 | BE | 11.05.2005 | CH | 11.05.2005 | CY | 11.05.2005 | FI | 11.05.2005 | LI | 11.05.2005 | TR | 11.05.2005 | DK | 11.08.2005 | GR | 11.08.2005 | SE | 11.08.2005 | PT | 19.10.2005 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/38] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
BE | 11.05.2005 | ||
CH | 11.05.2005 | ||
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
LI | 11.05.2005 | ||
TR | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
BE | 11.05.2005 | ||
CH | 11.05.2005 | ||
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
LI | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
BE | 11.05.2005 | ||
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 11.08.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5147282 (KAN WILLIAM [US]) [A] 1,20 * column 8, line 36 - column 9, line 54 *; | [A]US5851172 (BUECHE KENNETH M [US], et al) [A] 1,20* column 10, line 22 - line 37 *; | [DA]US6048300 (THORNTON RICHARD T [US], et al) [DA] 1,20 * column 5, line 8 - column 6, line 12 *; | [DA]US6137114 (ROHE KARL-HEINZ [DE], et al) [DA] 1,20 * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 56 * | Examination | EP1145739 | by applicant | US6048300 | US6137114 |