EP1225448 - Improved glucose monitor and test strip containers for use in same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diabetes Diagnostics, Inc. 200 Prospect Street Waltham, MA 02453 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [2002/30] | For all designated states Inverness Medical Technology, Inc. 200 Prospect Street Waltham, MA 02154 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McAleer, Jerome F. 52 Nobles Close Wantage, Oxfordshire OX12 0NR / GB | 02 /
Moerman, Piet H. C. Ph. de Denterghemlaan 2 9831 St Martens-Latem / BE | 03 /
Siu, Ta 21 Park Street Alhambra, CA 9180 / US | [2002/44] |
Former [2002/30] | 01 /
McAleer, Jerome F. 52 Nobles Close Wantage, Oxfordshire OX12 0NR / GB | ||
02 /
Moerman, Piet H. C. Grimbergsesteenweg 5 1980 Zemst / BE | |||
03 /
Siu, Ta 21 Park Street Alhambra, CA 9180 / US | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02076201.9 | 11.02.1997 | [2002/30] | Priority number, date | US19960600449 | 13.02.1996 Original published format: US 600449 | [2002/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1225448 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1225448 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | [2002/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1225448 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B01L11/00, G01N33/487, B01L9/00 | [2002/35] | CPC: |
B01L99/00 (EP,US);
G01N33/4875 (EP,US);
G01N35/00732 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00108 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00782 (EP,US);
Y10T436/112499 (EP,US);
Y10T436/115831 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/30] | G01N33/487, B01L9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/30] | Title | German: | Verbessertes Glucose-Messgerät und hierin zu verwendender Teststreifenbehälter | [2002/30] | English: | Improved glucose monitor and test strip containers for use in same | [2002/30] | French: | Dispositif perfectionné de controle du glucose et contenants pour bandes de test utilisables dans ce dispositif | [2002/30] | Examination procedure | 13.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 28.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97905915.1 / EP0880407 | Divisional application(s) | EP05076758.1 / EP1607137 | EP08075317.1 / EP1970123 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.02.2009
ADMISSIBLE Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [2009/15] | 03.04.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.06.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 24.07.2009 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/49] | Request for further processing for: | 10.02.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 09.02.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.03.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.05.2008 | BE | 28.05.2008 | DK | 28.05.2008 | FI | 28.05.2008 | NL | 28.05.2008 | SE | 28.08.2008 | GR | 29.08.2008 | ES | 08.09.2008 | PT | 28.10.2008 | CH | 28.02.2009 | LI | 28.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | [2010/47] |
Former [2009/47] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/42] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | ES | 08.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4303887 (HILL JEREMY R, et al) [Y] 1 * page 1, line 58 - page 2, line 20 * * column 12, line 25 - line 28; figure 1 *; | [A]US4852025 (HERPICHBOEHM BERND [DE]) [A] 1,5 * column 2, line 7 - line 47 * * column 3, line 50 - line 60 * * column 12, line 25 - line 32; figure 6 *; | [A]CH677149 (DISETRONIC AG) [A] 8-10,17,20,1,12 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 58 * * column 4, line 15 - line 19 * * column 4, line 49 - line 53 *; | [X]EP0567067 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 12-16,18,20 * column 1, line 1 - line 13 * * column 2, line 15 - line 20 * * column 9, line 1 - line 40 * * column 14, line 41 - line 52 ** column 22, line 8 - line 17 *; | [Y]US5277870 (FULLER MAURICE D [US], et al) [Y] 1 * column 1, line 29 - line 33 * * column 1, line 49 - line 53 * * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 23 *; | [A]WO9410558 (ENVIROMED PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, line 1 - line 6 * * page 2, paragraph 4 * * page 4, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 6 *; | [AX]EP0640393 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-5 * column 4, line 23 - line 31 * [X] 12; | [X]US5489414 (SCHREIBER JOERG [DE], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 15 - line 26 * * column 4, line 58 - line 60 * * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 12 * |