|
16.08.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2011 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.02.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.11.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.11.2010 |
Request for revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
02.11.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
60 |
|
02.11.2010 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
45 |
|
02.11.2010 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
67 |
|
02.11.2010 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.11.2010 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.11.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
17 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
18 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
14 |
|
27.09.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.08.2010 |
Communication concerning signing of documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2010 |
Annex |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.07.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.05.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Communication concerning signing of documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2010 |
Communication concerning signing of documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2010 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.05.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.05.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2010 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.05.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.10.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2007 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2007 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2007 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.07.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.06.2007 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.06.2007 |
Request for change of name |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.06.2007 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.05.2007 |
Request for change of name |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.02.2007 |
Staying of examination/opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2007 |
Staying of examination/opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2007 |
Staying of examination/opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2007 |
Staying of examination/opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2007 |
Staying of examination/opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2007 |
Staying of examination/opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
125 |
|
29.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.12.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.12.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.12.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.11.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.11.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.10.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2006 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
04.10.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.10.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
04.10.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
04.10.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.10.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
04.10.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
04.10.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.10.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.10.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
04.10.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.10.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
44 |
|
04.10.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Fax filed during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Fax filed during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Fax filed during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Fax filed during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Fax filed during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
41 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Fax filed during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.09.2006 |
Fax filed during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
26.09.2006 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
26.09.2006 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2005 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.2005 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2005 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.06.2005 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2005 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2005 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2005 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
24.01.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2004 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.06.2003 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2003 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2003 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.03.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.03.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
26.03.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.01.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.12.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.11.2002 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2002 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.11.2002 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2002 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.09.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2002 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.08.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.08.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2002 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2002 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.07.2002 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2002 |
Request for registering of a license |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
23.05.2002 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2002 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2002 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2002 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2002 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2002 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2002 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2002 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.04.2002 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2002 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.03.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
28.03.2002 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.03.2002 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.08.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
08.08.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
44 |