EP1255107 - Oil level and condition sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.08.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052 Troy, Michigan 48007 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052 Troy Michigan 48007 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ismail, Keith N. 6932 Imperial Ridge Drive El Paso, TX 79912 / US | 02 /
Lecea, Oscar A. 653 Morningside Drive Grand Blanc, MI 48439 / US | 03 /
Thomson, Steven D. 6305 Loma de Cristo El Paso, TX 79912 / US | [2002/45] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | Denton, Michael John Delphi Automotive Systems, Centre Technique Paris, 117, avenue des Nations, B.P. 60059 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 02076333.0 | 05.04.2002 | [2002/45] | Priority number, date | US20010849201 | 04.05.2001 Original published format: US 849201 | [2002/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1255107 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1255107 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | [2004/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/28, G01N27/22, G01F23/26 | [2004/27] | CPC: |
G01F23/265 (EP,US);
G01F23/268 (EP,US);
G01N33/2888 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/45] | G01N33/28, G01F23/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/13] |
Former [2002/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Ölpegel- und Ölzustandssensor | [2002/45] | English: | Oil level and condition sensor | [2002/45] | French: | Capteur de mesure du niveau et de l'état d'huile | [2002/45] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/12] | 08.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.06.2008 | 05.05.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/40] | 25.05.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/40] | 16.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]SU798576 ; | [XA]US3123751 (BALSBAUGH S.) [X] 1,4,5 * column 1, line 18 * * column 2, line 1 - line 8 * * column 2, line 41 - line 67 * * column 3, line 12 - line 19 * * column 4, line 24 - line 29 * * column 4, line 38 - line 41 * * figures 1,4,5 * [A] 2,3,6-10; | [A]US3524116 (BRAY WILLIAM O) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [XY]SU798576 (MO I KHIM MASH [SU]) [X] 1,4,5,8 * column 1, lines 1-10 * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 2 * * column 4, line 11 - line 22 * * column 4, line 35 - line 41 * * column 6, line 8 - line 15 * [Y] 2,3,6,7,9,10,12-21; | [A]US4392378 (PITCHES BRIAN E [GB], et al) [A] 1-21* the whole document *; | [XY]DE19511556 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 11 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 11 * * column 3, line 30 - line 42 * * figure 1 * [Y] 2,3,6,7,9,10,12-21; | [XY]DE19757924 (MANNESMANN VDO AG [DE]) [X] 11 * column 1, line 3 - line 22 * * column 3, line 23 - line 34 * * figure 1 * [Y] 2,3,6,7,9,10,12-21; | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1981, no. 42, Database accession no. 1981-K9224D, XP002279400 & SU798576 A 19810123 (MOSCOW CHEM EQUIP INST) [X] 1,4,5,8 * abstract * [Y] 2,3,6,7,9,10,12-21 | Examination | EP0338400 |