EP1251189 - Controlling the thickness of an evaporated or sublimed organic layer during production of an organic light-emitting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2002/43] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Slyke, Steven A. Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Marcus, Michael A. Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
Spoonhower, John P. Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 04 /
Spahn, Robert G. Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 05 /
Freeman, Dennis R. Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2002/43] | Representative(s) | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [2002/43] | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe Kodak Limited, Patent Department (W92)-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 02076381.9 | 08.04.2002 | [2002/43] | Priority number, date | US20010839885 | 20.04.2001 Original published format: US 839885 | [2002/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1251189 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1251189 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/54 | [2002/43] | CPC: |
C23C14/547 (EP,US);
H05B33/10 (KR);
C23C14/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/29] |
Former [2002/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kontrolle der Dicke einer aufgedampften oder aufsublimierten organischen Schicht während der Herstellung eines organischen licht-emittierenden Bauteils | [2002/43] | English: | Controlling the thickness of an evaporated or sublimed organic layer during production of an organic light-emitting device | [2002/43] | French: | Contrôle d'épaisseur d'une couche déposée par évaporation ou par sublimation pendant la fabrication d' un dispositif émetteur de lumière | [2002/43] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 07.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5860531 ; | [A]US4676883 (NELSON ROGER E [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 29 - column 3, line 6; figures 1,3-5 *; | [AP]EP1170396 (JAPAN AVIATION ELECTRON [JP]) [AP] 1-10 * abstract * * page 6, line 30 - page 7, line 14; figures 14,15,16B * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830629), vol. 007, no. 148, Database accession no. (E - 184), & JP58060531 A 19830411 (NIPPON SHINKU GIJUTSU KK) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |