EP1271275 - Electronically controlled pedal assembly having a hysteresis generating structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2005 [2005/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELEFLEX INCORPORATED 630 West Germantown Pike, Suite 450 Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Teleflex Incorporated 630 West Germantown Pike, Suite 450 Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Menzies, Bradley C. 3017 Cherokee Avenue Flint, Michigan 48507 / US | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Pawlyn, Anthony Neil Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/43] | Pawlyn, Anthony Neil Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2003/01] | Wharton, Peter Robert Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02076538.4 | 19.04.2002 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | US20010865800 | 25.05.2001 Original published format: US 865800 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1271275 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G05G1/14 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
G05G1/30 (EP,US);
B60K26/02 (KR);
B60K26/021 (EP,US);
B60T7/042 (EP,US);
G05G1/42 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20528 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/39] |
Former [2003/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Elektronisch kontrollierte Pedaleinheit mit eine Anordnung für die Einführung einer Hysterese | [2003/01] | English: | Electronically controlled pedal assembly having a hysteresis generating structure | [2003/01] | French: | Ensemble de pédale commandé électroniquement avec structure fournissant une hystérésis | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 30.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/33] | 17.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5819593 (RIXON CHRISTOPHER J [CA], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 48 - column 5, line 37 * * figures 1-6 *; | [DA]US6158299 (CZAJKOWSKI JULIAN [GB]) [DA] 1 * abstract ** figures 1-8 *; | [A]US6220222 (KALSI AVTAR [CA]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 31 * * figures 5,6 * | by applicant | US5408899 | US6158299 |