EP1359359 - Screw thread connector seal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2004 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.02.2005 [2005/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cole, Anthony Thomas Volmerlaan 8 2288 GD Rijswijk / NL | [2003/45] | Application number, filing date | 02076686.1 | 29.04.2002 | [2003/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1359359 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16L15/04 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
F16L15/04 (EP);
F16L13/11 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/31] |
Former [2003/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Dichtung für Schraubgewindeverbindung | [2003/45] | English: | Screw thread connector seal | [2003/45] | French: | Joint d'étanchéité pour connecteur vissé | [2003/45] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/05] | 25.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/05] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.06.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.06.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2313074 (JEWELL HOWARD W) [A] 1,2,4 * the whole document *; | [X]GB966772 (MONTAPLAST G M B H) [X] 1,2 * page 3, line 37 - line 66 *; | [Y]US4226444 (BUNYAN THOMAS W) [Y] 3 * column 3, line 5 - line 8; figures 1,3,6 *; | [Y]US4432883 (DENZINE ALLEN F [US], et al) [Y] 4,6 * column 1, line 5 - line 10 * * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 2 * * column 3, line 6 - line 42 * * column 4, line 39 - column 5, line 7; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0233802 (VALLOUREC IND [FR]) [A] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document *; | [XY]US4828295 (PLAQUIN BERNARD [FR], et al) [X] 1,5 * column 1, line 10 - line 13 * * column 4, line 50 - column 6, line 3; figures 6,7 * [Y] 6; | [A]US5077359 (MOORE ALBERT L [US]) [A] 4* abstract *; | [XY]FR2691519 (MARCHAL PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 4 - line 27 * * page 4, line 1 - line 7 * * page 4, line 27 - line 30 * * page 11, line 7 - page 12, line 12 * * figures 1,2,5,9; claim 17 * [Y] 3,4; | [A]US5520422 (FRIEDRICH RALPH [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract * |