EP1308913 - Intelligent electrical devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 19.09.2007 [2007/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Azoteq (Proprietary) Limited c/o 109 Main Street Paarl / ZA | [2003/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bruwer, Frederick Johannes c/o 109 Main Street Paarl, South Africa / ZA | [2003/19] | Representative(s) | Jones, Stephen Anthony AdamsonJones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | Jones, Stephen Anthony AdamsonJones Broadway Business Centre 32a Stoney Street Nottingham NG1 1LL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02076767.9 | 08.10.1999 | [2003/19] | Priority number, date | US19980169395 | 09.10.1998 Original published format: US 169395 | [2003/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1308913 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1308913 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/18, G06F5/00 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
H05B39/041 (EP,US);
H05B39/044 (EP,US);
H05B39/085 (EP,US);
H05B39/09 (EP,US);
H05B47/10 (EP,US);
H05B47/16 (EP,US);
H05B47/175 (EP,US);
H05B47/185 (EP,US);
H05B47/165 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/19] | Title | German: | Intelligente elektrische Gerät | [2003/19] | English: | Intelligent electrical devices | [2003/19] | French: | Appareil électrique intelligent | [2003/19] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2002 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 30.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01205208.0 / EP1206168 | EP99952050.5 / EP1120018 | Divisional application(s) | EP04078374.8 / EP1530178 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.08.2005 | BE | 31.08.2005 | CH | 31.08.2005 | ES | 31.08.2005 | FI | 31.08.2005 | IT | 31.08.2005 | LI | 31.08.2005 | NL | 31.08.2005 | CY | 08.10.2005 | IE | 10.10.2005 | LU | 31.10.2005 | MC | 31.10.2005 | DK | 30.11.2005 | GR | 30.11.2005 | SE | 30.11.2005 | PT | 22.02.2006 | [2007/38] |
Former [2007/20] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
ES | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
CY | 08.10.2005 | ||
IE | 10.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 22.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
ES | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
IE | 10.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 22.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
IE | 10.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 22.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 22.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 22.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 22.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
NL | 31.08.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5055268 (MARTIN PETER G [US]) [X] 1-20 * column 2, line 31 - column 5, line 18 *; | [X]US5418433 (NILSSEN OLE K [US]) [X] 1-20 * column 2, line 13 - column 6, line 34 *; | [X]WO9636099 (ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC [US]) [X] 1-20 * page 5, line 12 - page 7, line 21 *; | [E]US6037744 (RHODES MICHAEL E [US]) [E] 1-20 * column W *; | [E]US6249089 (BRUWER FREDERICK J [ZA]) [E] 1-20* column W * |