EP1362621 - Safety device through energy absorption, composed of rods and nets aimed at stopping skiers falling at high speed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adic Promotion S.A. 8 rue de la Pierrière, Bitry 45300 Guigneville / FR | [2003/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frapier, Denis Jean-Marie 6 Boulevard Julien Potin Neuilly sur seine, Hauts de Seine / FR | [2003/47] | Application number, filing date | 02076895.8 | 15.05.2002 | [2003/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1362621 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A63C19/00 | [2003/47] | CPC: |
A63C19/10 (EP);
A63B71/022 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/47] | Title | German: | Sicherheitseinrichtung durch Auffangen der Energie, zusammengesetzt aus Stützen und Netzen zum Stilllegen von bei hoher Geschwindigkeit stürzenden Skifahrern | [2003/47] | English: | Safety device through energy absorption, composed of rods and nets aimed at stopping skiers falling at high speed | [2003/47] | French: | Dispositif de sécurité par absorption d'énergie comprenant mats et filets et destinès à arreter des skieurs tombant à grande vitesse | [2003/47] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 24.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/14] | 05.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3948351 (BAUMANN RENE) [X] 1-4 * column 3, lines 25-51 - column 5, lines 10-40; figures 1,9 * [A] 7-9; | [A]DE3135902 (MAIBACH GERD DIETER) [A] 1,7-9 * figure 1; claims 1,2 *; | [XA]FR2564002 (WIEDERMANN ANTON [AT]) [X] 1,4,5 * page 1, lines 1-5 - page 2, lines 32-37; figures 1,4,5,10; claims 5,6 * [A] 6-9; | [XA]DE4010209 (BAUMEISTER & OSTLER GMBH CO [DE]) [X] 1,5 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 10; figures 1-3 * * column 4, lines 41-43 * [A] 6,9; | [A]AT400815B (BERGER JOHANN [AT]) [A] 1,5,7* figure 8 *; | [A]US5961099 (THOMMEN JR ROBERT A [US]) [A] 1,9 * figure 1 *; | [XA]DE19822162 (BRECHT THOMAS [DE]) [X] 1,3-5 * column 1, line 11 - column 2, line 7 * [A] 6,9; | [A]EP1092456 (STEINBACH CHRISTIAN [AT]) [A] 1,4,5,9 * column 1, lines 1-5 - column 3, lines 32-34; figure 3; claim 7 * |