EP1267317 - Tack free edge for pressure sensitive adhesive web [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bourdelais, Robert Paul Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Seyna, John J. Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
Palmeri, John M. Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 04 /
Spencer, Robert Gordon Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2002/51] | Representative(s) | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 02077140.8 | 30.05.2002 | [2002/51] | Priority number, date | US20010878829 | 11.06.2001 Original published format: US 878829 | [2002/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1267317 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/51] | Classification | IPC: | G09F3/10 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
G09F3/10 (EP,US);
Y10T428/14 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24777 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2486 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24893 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Druckempfindliches Klebeband mit haftfreiem Rand | [2002/51] | English: | Tack free edge for pressure sensitive adhesive web | [2002/51] | French: | Ruban adhésif autocollant avec bord non collant | [2002/51] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/27] | 25.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |