EP1271230 - Storage phosphor cassette with shock absorbing corner elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wendlandt, William Carl Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Peek, Daniel N. Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 02077370.1 | 17.06.2002 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | US20010896735 | 29.06.2001 Original published format: US 896735 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1271230 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1271230 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G03B42/04 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
G03B42/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/39] |
Former [2003/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Speicherphosphorkassette mit stossdämpfenden Eckelementen | [2003/01] | English: | Storage phosphor cassette with shock absorbing corner elements | [2003/01] | French: | Cassette à plaque de stockage phosphoreuse avec éléments de coin pour absorber les chocs | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 28.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/31] | 03.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0736130 ; | [A]EP0075785 (AGFA GEVAERT AG [DE]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]JPS61192638 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950630), vol. 1995, no. 05, & JP07036130 A 19950207 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870116), vol. 011, no. 016, Database accession no. (M - 554), & JP61192638 A 19860827 (TOSHIBA CORP;OTHERS: 01) [A] * abstract * * figure 1 * |