EP1249229 - Sustained delivery of an active agent using an implantable system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intarcia Therapeutics, Inc 24650 Industrial Boulevard Hayward CA 94545 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states Intarcia Therapeutics, Inc. 24650 Industrial Blvd. Emeryville CA 94545 / US | ||
Former [2002/42] | For all designated states ALZA Corporation 1900 Charleston Road, P.O. Box 7210 Mountain View, CA 94039-7210 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eckenhoff, Bonnie J. 1080 Autumn Lane Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 02 /
Peery, John R. P.O. Box 5128 Stanford, CA 94309 / US | 03 /
Dionne, Keith E. c/o Millenium Pharmaceuticals, 640 Memorial Drive OBW-13 (1332), Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 04 /
Landrau, Felix A. 5101 Almar Drive Punta Gorda, FL 33950 / US | 05 /
Lautenbach, Scott D. 466 23rd Avenue San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | 06 /
Magruder, Judy A. 1233 Wasatch Drive Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 07 /
Wright, Jeremy C. 631 Cuesta Drive Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | [2003/15] |
Former [2002/42] | 01 /
Eckenhoff, Bonnie J. 1080 Autumn Lane Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | ||
02 /
Peery, John R. P.O. Box 5128 Stanford, CA 94309 / US | |||
03 /
Dionne, Keith E. 704 Laurel Avenue Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | |||
04 /
Landrau, Felix A. 5101 Almar Drive Punta Gorda, FL 33950 / US | |||
05 /
Lautenbach, Scott D. 466 23rd Avenue San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | |||
06 /
Magruder, Judy A. 1233 Wasatch Drive Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | |||
07 /
Wright, Jeremy C. 631 Cuesta Drive Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | Representative(s) | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2002/42] | Brown, Fraser Gregory James, et al fJ Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02077519.3 | 15.01.1997 | [2002/42] | Priority number, date | US19960595761 | 02.02.1996 Original published format: US 595761 | [2002/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1249229 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1249229 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | [2005/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00 | [2002/42] | CPC: |
A61K9/0004 (EP,US);
A61K9/00 (KR);
A61K38/09 (EP,US);
A61K9/0024 (EP,US);
A61M5/14526 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14513 (EP,US);
A61M2206/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2002/42] | Title | German: | Verzögerte Freisetzung von einem aktiven Wirkstoff unter Verwendung einer implantierbaren Vorrichtung | [2002/42] | English: | Sustained delivery of an active agent using an implantable system | [2002/42] | French: | Libération contrôlée d'un principe actif à l'aide d'un dispositif implantable | [2002/42] | Examination procedure | 25.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/42] | 06.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/07] | 19.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/07] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97902971.7 / EP0877599 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0373867 (ALZA CORP [US]) [A] 1-48 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0627231 (ALZA CORP [US]) [A] 1-48* the whole document * |