EP1271341 - System for analysing textual data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
TR
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [2003/01] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
TR
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cronin, Oral S.T., c/o Unilever Res. Port Sunlight Quarry Road East, Bebington Wirral, Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 02 /
El Deredy, Wael, c/o Unilever Res. Port Sunlight Quarry Road East, Bebington Wirral, Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 03 /
Harbron, Christopher George 14 Church Street St. Clements, Sandwich, Kent CT13 93H / GB | 04 /
Hayet, Marie, c/o Unilever Res. Port Sunlight Quarry Road East, Bebington Wirral, Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 05 /
Patel, Shail, c/o Unilever Res. Port Sunlight Quarry Road East, Bebington Wirral, Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Joppe, Hermina Laura Petronella Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Joppe, Hermina L. P. Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 02077555.7 | 27.06.2002 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | EP20010306519 | 30.06.2001 Original published format: EP 01306519 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1271341 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1271341 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/28 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
G06F40/284 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System zur Auswertung von Text-Daten | [2003/01] | English: | System for analysing textual data | [2003/01] | French: | Système pour l'analyse de données textuelles | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5867811 (O'DONOGHUE TIMOTHY FRANCIS [GB]) [A] 1,16,17* abstract *; | [X]US5924108 (FEIN RONALD A [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * abstract *; | [X]US5924105 (PUNCH III WILLIAM F [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * abstract *; | [X]US6167368 (WACHOLDER FAYE NINA P [US]) [X] 1-17 * abstract *; | [A] - JACOBS P S, "USING STATISTICAL METHODS TO IMPROVE KNOWLEDGE-BASED NEWS CATEGORIZATION", IEEE EXPERT, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19930401), vol. 8, no. 2, ISSN 0885-9000, pages 13 - 23, XP000359126 [A] 1,16,17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/64.207425 |