EP1276315 - A method for processing a digital image to adjust brightness [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [2011/12] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dupin, Michael W. c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Luo, Jiebo c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2010/45] |
Former [2003/03] | 01 /
Dupin, Michael W. c/o Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | ||
02 /
Luo, Jiebo c/o Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Representative(s) | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Boite n 2 Zone d'activité SAONEOR 12 rue Alfred Kastler 71530 Fragnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Industrie, Département Brevets, CRT, Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2003/03] | Parent, Yves, et al KODAK INDUSTRIE Département Brevets - CRT Zone Industrielle B.P. 21 71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 02077603.5 | 01.07.2002 | [2003/03] | Priority number, date | US20010904366 | 12.07.2001 Original published format: US 904366 | [2003/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1276315 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1276315 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | [2008/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1276315 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/60, H04N1/407, G06T5/40 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
G06T5/40 (EP,US);
G06T5/92 (EP,US);
G06T7/136 (EP,US);
H04N1/6027 (EP,US);
H04N1/628 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10024 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/03] | H04N1/60 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/18] |
Former [2003/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungsverfahren zur Regelung der Helligkeit von numerischen Bildern | [2003/03] | English: | A method for processing a digital image to adjust brightness | [2003/03] | French: | Procédé de traitement d'images pour le réglage de la luminosité dans une image numérisée | [2003/03] | Examination procedure | 12.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 21.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | 02.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5418895 (LEE HSIEN-CHE [US]) [Y] 5-7 * column 4, line 28 - column 6, line 36; figure 3 *; | [XY]JPH11331738 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 1-4,12,13 [Y] 5-11; | [XY]US6249317 (HASHIMOTO NOBUO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 11; | US6850272 [ ] (TERASHITA TAKAAKI [JP]) [ ] * column 1, line 21 - line 26 * * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 32 ** column 6, line 61 - column 10, line 32; figure 1 *; | [Y] - JONES M J ET AL, "Statistical color models with application to skin detection", 19990623; 19990623 - 19990625, (19990623), vol. 1, pages 274 - 280, XP010347653 [Y] 8-10 * page 2 - page 5 * | [Y] - LUO J ET AL, "Towards physics-based segmentation of photographic color images", IMAGE PROCESSING, 1997. PROCEEDINGS., INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SANTA BARBARA, CA, USA 26-29 OCT. 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19971026), vol. 3, ISBN 978-0-8186-8183-7, pages 58 - 61, XP010253647 [Y] 9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.1997.631979 | by applicant | US4203671 | US5418895 | US5959720 | JPH11331738 | US6249317 | - GOLL ET AL., "Modem Exposure Determination for Customizing Photofinishing Printer Response", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHOTOGRAPHIC ENGINEERING, (1979), vol. 5, no. 2 | - JONES M.J. ET AL., STATISTICAL COLOR MODELS WITH APPLICATION TO SKIN DETECTION, (19990623), vol. 1, pages 274 - 280 | - LUO J. ET AL., "Towards physics-based segmentation of photographic color images", IMAGE PROCESSING, 1997. PROCEEDINGS., INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SANTA BARBARA, (19971026), vol. 3, pages 58 - 61 | - GOLL ET AL., JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHOTOGRAPHIC ENGINEERING, (1979), vol. 5, no. 2 |