EP1381063 - Method for adjusting the switch-gap between the contact tongues of a reed switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kearney-National Netherlands Holding B.V. Jan Campertstraat 5 6416 SG Heerlen / NL | [2004/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van Gastel, Gerardus Judocus Cornelis Riel 1 5647 LB Eindhoven / NL | [2004/03] | Representative(s) | Valkonet, Rutger, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Valkonet, Rutger, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2004/03] | Valkonet, Rutger, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 02077741.3 | 10.07.2002 | [2004/03] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1381063 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1381063 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01H11/00 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
H01H11/005 (EP,US);
H01H1/66 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Regelung der Schaltstrecke der Kontaktzungen in einem Reed-Schalter | [2004/03] | English: | Method for adjusting the switch-gap between the contact tongues of a reed switch | [2004/03] | French: | Procédé de réglage de l'écartement des languettes de contact d'un commutateur à tiges | [2004/03] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 01.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.11.2004 | BE | 24.11.2004 | BG | 24.11.2004 | CH | 24.11.2004 | EE | 24.11.2004 | ES | 24.11.2004 | FI | 24.11.2004 | LI | 24.11.2004 | TR | 24.11.2004 | DK | 24.02.2005 | GR | 24.02.2005 | SE | 24.02.2005 | PT | 24.04.2005 | CY | 10.07.2005 | LU | 10.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/26] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
BE | 24.11.2004 | ||
BG | 24.11.2004 | ||
CH | 24.11.2004 | ||
EE | 24.11.2004 | ||
ES | 24.11.2004 | ||
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
LI | 24.11.2004 | ||
TR | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
SE | 24.02.2005 | ||
CY | 10.07.2005 | ||
LU | 10.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
BE | 24.11.2004 | ||
BG | 24.11.2004 | ||
CH | 24.11.2004 | ||
EE | 24.11.2004 | ||
ES | 24.11.2004 | ||
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
LI | 24.11.2004 | ||
TR | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
SE | 24.02.2005 | ||
CY | 10.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
BE | 24.11.2004 | ||
BG | 24.11.2004 | ||
CH | 24.11.2004 | ||
EE | 24.11.2004 | ||
ES | 24.11.2004 | ||
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
LI | 24.11.2004 | ||
TR | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
SE | 24.02.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
BE | 24.11.2004 | ||
BG | 24.11.2004 | ||
CH | 24.11.2004 | ||
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
LI | 24.11.2004 | ||
TR | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
BE | 24.11.2004 | ||
BG | 24.11.2004 | ||
CH | 24.11.2004 | ||
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
LI | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
BE | 24.11.2004 | ||
BG | 24.11.2004 | ||
CH | 24.11.2004 | ||
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
LI | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
BG | 24.11.2004 | ||
CH | 24.11.2004 | ||
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
LI | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 24.02.2005 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 24.11.2004 | |
BG | 24.11.2004 | ||
CH | 24.11.2004 | ||
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
LI | 24.11.2004 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/30] | BG | 24.11.2004 | |
CH | 24.11.2004 | ||
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
LI | 24.11.2004 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 24.11.2004 | |
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
LI | 24.11.2004 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 24.11.2004 | |
FI | 24.11.2004 | ||
LI | 24.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 24.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0731978 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [DA] 1 * page 4, line 24 - page 6, line 6; figure - *; | [A]WO0116042 (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO [JP], et al) [A] 1* abstract * |