EP1391747 - Synthesized averaging using SMASH for elimination of motion artifacts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bydder, Mark Int. Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Larkman, David James Int. Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
V. Hajnal, Joseph Int. Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2004/09] | Representative(s) | Wolfs, Marc Johannes Maria, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/09] | Wolfs, Marc Johannes Maria, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 02078213.2 | 05.08.2002 | [2004/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1391747 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/565 | [2004/09] | CPC: |
G01R33/56509 (EP);
G01R33/561 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, NL [2004/47] |
Former [2004/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Synthetisierte Mittelung mittels SMASH zur Eliminierung von Bewegungsartefakten | [2004/09] | English: | Synthesized averaging using SMASH for elimination of motion artifacts | [2004/09] | French: | Calcul d'une moyenne synthétisée par acquisition simultanée d'harmoniques spatiales (SMASH) | [2004/09] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/44] | 28.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/18] | 15.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - GRISWOLD M A ET AL, "Alternative EPI Acquisition Strategies Using SMASH", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE. 6TH SCIENTIFIC MEETING AND EXHIBITION. ISMRM '98. SYDNEY, APRIL 18 - 24, 1998,, vol. 1, ISSN 1065-9889, page 423, XP002143384 [X] 1,2,5-7 * conference abstract * | [X] - S.KUHARA ET AL., "A Novel EPI Reconstruction Technique using Multiple RF Coil Sensitivity Maps", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, EIGHTH SCIENTIFIC MEETING AND EXHIBITION, DENVER, COLORADO, USA, 1-7 APRIL 2000, vol. 1, page 154, XP002204140 [X] 1,2,5-7 * conference abstract * | [X] - M.BYDDER ET AL., "Motion artefact reduction using SMASH", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, 9TH SCIENTIFIC MEETING AND EXHIBITION, EUROPEAN SOC. FOR MAGN. RES. IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, 18TH ANNUAL MEETING AND EXHIBITION, HELD JOINTLY, 21-27 APRIL 2001, GLASGOW, UK, vol. 1, page 734, XP002204141 [X] 1,2,4,6,7 * conference abstract * | [X] - BYDDER M ET AL, "Detection and elimination of motion artifacts by regeneration of k-space", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, APRIL 2002, WILEY, USA, vol. 47, no. 4, ISSN 0740-3194, pages 677 - 686, XP002204142 [X] 1-7 * see the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mrm.10093 | [A] - MADORE B ET AL, "A NEW WAY OF AVERAGING WITH APLLICATIONS TO MRI", MEDICAL PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (1996), vol. 23, no. 1, ISSN 0094-2405, pages 109 - 113, XP000554240 [A] 1-7 * see chapters 'Introduction' and 'Theory' * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.597687 |