EP1258749 - High efficiency polarized display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis MN 55408 / US | ||
Former [2006/43] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza MN12-8251 P.O. Box 524 Minneapolis Minnesota 55440-0524 / US | ||
Former [2002/47] | For all designated states Honeywell Inc. Honeywell Plaza MN12-8251 P.O. Box 524 Minneapolis Minnesota 55440-0524 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Larson, Brent D. 4713 E. Cascalote Drive Cave Creek, Arizona 85331 / US | [2002/47] | Representative(s) | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/47] | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert, et al Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02078465.8 | 28.03.1996 | [2002/47] | Priority number, date | US19950418981 | 07.04.1995 Original published format: US 418981 | [2002/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1258749 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1258749 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | [2004/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1258749 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/30, G02F1/1335, H04N9/31 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
G03B21/604 (EP,US);
G02B19/0047 (EP,US);
G02B27/283 (EP,US);
G02B27/286 (EP,US);
G02B3/005 (EP,US);
G02B3/0056 (EP,US);
G02B5/3008 (EP,US);
G02B5/3033 (EP,US);
G02B5/305 (EP,US);
G02B5/3083 (EP,US);
G02F1/133528 (EP,US);
G02F1/13362 (EP,US);
G02B6/0056 (EP,US);
G02F1/133504 (EP,US);
G02F1/133536 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/47] | G02B5/30, G02F1/1335 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/47] | Title | German: | Polarisierte Anzeige mit hohem Wirkungsgrad | [2002/47] | English: | High efficiency polarized display | [2002/47] | French: | Afficheur polarisé de haute efficacité | [2002/47] | Examination procedure | 22.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 16.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96915901.1 / EP0819259 | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/40] | Request for further processing for: | 08.05.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 19.05.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.06.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 25.10.2006 | [2007/38] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS63168626 ; | [A]US2123902 (LAND EDWIN H) [A] 1-3 * column W *; | [A]US3213753 (ROGERS HOWARD G) [A] 1-3* column W *; | [A]US3610729 (ROGERS HOWARD G) [A] 1-3 * column W *; | [DA]US4688897 (GRINBERG JAN [US], et al) [DA] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]WO9004805 (FERGASON JAMES L [US]) [A] 1-3 * column W *; | [A]EP0399506 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [A] 1-3 * column W *; | [A]EP0506176 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-3 * column W *; | [A]EP0573905 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-3 * column W *; | [A]WO9411776 (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [XA] - ANONYMOUS, "POLARIZER", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, (19930701), no. 351, pages 452 - 453, XP000387243 [X] 3 * column W * [A] 1,2 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881118), vol. 012, no. 439, Database accession no. (P - 788), & JP63168626 A 19880712 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | [A] - APHONIN O A ET AL, "OPTICAL PROPERTIES OF STRETCHED POLYMER DISPERSED LIQUID CRYSTAL FILMS", LIQUID CRYSTALS, (19930901), vol. 15, no. 3, pages 395 - 407, XP000396377 [A] 1-3 * column W * |